This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/12/2018 at 19:50:03 (UTC).

Petition of Kling

Case Summary

On 09/14/2015 Petition of Kling was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LISA SCHALL. The case status is Other - Voided.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Voided

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

LISA SCHALL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kling, Clarence James

Defendant

Kling

 

Court Documents

Petition for Change of Name

Petition for Change of Name voided on 10/19/2015.

Notice of Voided Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Denied in Whole) filed by Kling, Clarence James.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name submitted by Kling, Clarence James rejected on 09/25/2015.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kling, Clarence James.

Petition for Change of Name

Petition for Change of Name filed by Kling, Clarence James.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Change of Name voided on 10/19/2015. Filed By: Kling, Clarence James (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 11]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Hearing on Name Change scheduled for 11/06/2015 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-46 Lisa Schall was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Denied in Whole) filed by Kling, Clarence James.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause for Change of Name submitted by Kling, Clarence James rejected on 09/25/2015. Filed By: Kling, Clarence James (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Hearing on Name Change scheduled for 11/06/2015 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-46 Lisa Schall.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Schall, Lisa.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Kling, Clarence James. Filed By: Kling, Clarence James (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kling, Clarence James. Filed By: Kling, Clarence James (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Change of Name filed by Kling, Clarence James. Filed By: Kling, Clarence James (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less