This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/16/2020 at 01:05:22 (UTC).

Petition of Keppler

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Petition of Keppler was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Keppler, Anna Hedlicka

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (**AMENDED**) filed by Keppler, Anna Hedlicka.

Petition for Change of Name

Petition for Change of Name filed by Keppler, Anna Hedlicka.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Keppler, Anna Hedlicka.

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by Keppler, Anna Hedlicka.

Proposed Decree Change Name

Proposed Decree Change Name filed by Keppler, Anna Hedlicka.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Keppler, Anna

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Name Change scheduled for 02/25/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-23 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Name Change scheduled for 04/14/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-23 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (**AMENDED**) filed by Keppler, Anna Hedlicka. Filed By: Keppler, Anna Hedlicka (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name filed by Keppler, Anna Hedlicka. Filed By: Keppler, Anna Hedlicka (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Keppler, Anna Hedlicka. Filed By: Keppler, Anna Hedlicka (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Keppler, Anna Hedlicka. Filed By: Keppler, Anna Hedlicka (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by Keppler, Anna Hedlicka. Filed By: Keppler, Anna Hedlicka (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-23.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketHearing on Name Change scheduled for 02/25/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-23 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Decree Change Name filed by Keppler, Anna Hedlicka. Filed By: Keppler, Anna Hedlicka (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Keppler, Anna

    Read MoreRead Less