Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 07:00:07 (UTC).

Petition of Johnson

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Petition of Johnson was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Edington, Alicia Claire

Johnson, Jarrod Paul

 

Court Documents

Decree Changing Name

Decree Changing Name (GRANTED) filed by Johnson, Jarrod Paul; Edington, Alicia Claire.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Name Change heard 03/03/2020 08:30:00 AM.

Proof of Service by Publication

Proof of Service by Publication filed by Johnson, Jarrod Paul; Edington, Alicia Claire. Refers to: Johnson, Jarrod; Edington, Alicia

Petition for Change of Name

Petition for Change of Name filed by Johnson, Jarrod Paul; Edington, Alicia Claire.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johnson, Jarrod Paul; Edington, Alicia Claire.

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by Johnson, Jarrod Paul; Edington, Alicia Claire.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proposed Decree Change Name

Proposed Decree Change Name submitted by Johnson, Jarrod Paul; Edington, Alicia Claire received but not filed on 01/15/2020.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree Changing Name (GRANTED) filed by Johnson, Jarrod Paul; Edington, Alicia Claire. Filed By: Johnson, Jarrod Paul (Petitioner); Edington, Alicia Claire (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name filed by Alicia Claire Edington and Jarrod Paul Johnson was granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Name Change heard 03/03/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Publication filed by Johnson, Jarrod Paul; Edington, Alicia Claire. Refers to: Johnson, Jarrod; Edington, Alicia Filed By: Johnson, Jarrod Paul (Petitioner); Edington, Alicia Claire (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name filed by Johnson, Jarrod Paul; Edington, Alicia Claire. Filed By: Johnson, Jarrod Paul (Petitioner); Edington, Alicia Claire (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johnson, Jarrod Paul; Edington, Alicia Claire. Filed By: Johnson, Jarrod Paul (Petitioner); Edington, Alicia Claire (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by Johnson, Jarrod Paul; Edington, Alicia Claire. Filed By: Johnson, Jarrod Paul (Petitioner); Edington, Alicia Claire (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-23.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketHearing on Name Change scheduled for 03/03/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-23 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Decree Change Name submitted by Johnson, Jarrod Paul; Edington, Alicia Claire received but not filed on 01/15/2020. Filed By: Johnson, Jarrod Paul (Petitioner); Edington, Alicia Claire (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less