Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 09:04:31 (UTC).

Petition of CAILE

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 Petition of CAILE was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CAILE, SHREVE

CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Proof of Service by Publication

Proof of Service by Publication filed by CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL; CAILE, SHREVE. Refers to: CAILE, EMELIE

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Decree Changing Name (Change of Name of Minor by Guardian)

Decree Changing Name (Change of Name of Minor by Guardian) (Emelie Noel Caile, a minor) filed by CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL; CAILE, SHREVE. Refers to: CAILE, EMELIE

Decree Changing Name

Decree Changing Name (Nunc Pro Tunc to 8/26/20) filed by CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL; CAILE, SHREVE. Refers to: CAILE, EMELIE

Petition for Change of Name

Petition for Change of Name filed by CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL; CAILE, SHREVE. Refers to: CAILE, EMELIE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL; CAILE, SHREVE. Refers to: CAILE, EMELIE

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL; CAILE, SHREVE. Refers to: CAILE, EMELIE

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree Changing Name (Nunc Pro Tunc to 8/26/20) filed by CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL; CAILE, SHREVE. Refers to: CAILE, EMELIE Filed By: CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL (Petitioner); CAILE, SHREVE (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name filed by Lynn Seawell Caile & Shreve Caile was granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Publication filed by CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL; CAILE, SHREVE. Refers to: CAILE, EMELIE Filed By: CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL (Petitioner); CAILE, SHREVE (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree Changing Name (Change of Name of Minor by Guardian) (Emelie Noel Caile, a minor) filed by CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL; CAILE, SHREVE. Refers to: CAILE, EMELIE Filed By: CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL (Petitioner); CAILE, SHREVE (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name filed by CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL; CAILE, SHREVE. Refers to: CAILE, EMELIE Filed By: CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL (Petitioner); CAILE, SHREVE (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL; CAILE, SHREVE. Refers to: CAILE, EMELIE Filed By: CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL (Petitioner); CAILE, SHREVE (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL; CAILE, SHREVE. Refers to: CAILE, EMELIE Filed By: CAILE, LYNN SEAWELL (Petitioner); CAILE, SHREVE (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-23.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketHearing on Name Change scheduled for 04/07/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-23 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less