Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 07:36:36 (UTC).

Petition in RE: 3605 Florence Street, San Diego, CA 92113

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 Petition in RE 3605 Florence Street, San Diego, CA 92113 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Clear Recon Corp

Respondents

Tillory, James K

Tillory, Mary E

James Kevin Tillory Successor Trustee of the Arlister L Tillory and Mary E Tillory Trust Dated December 9, 2004

Tillory, Arlister L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rankin, Casper J

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

 

Court Documents

Brief - Other

Brief - Other (Report of: Organized Crimes and Public Corruption) filed by Tillory, James K.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Tillory, James K.

Notice of Entry of Order to Allow Clear Recon Corp to Deposit the Surplus Proceeds of the Trustee's Sale and for the Discharge of Clear Recon Corp

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Clear Recon Corp.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted) filed by Tillory, James K.

Order - Other

Order - Other (ORDER T DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS) filed by Clear Recon Corp.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposits of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustees Sale

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposits of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustees Sale filed by Clear Recon Corp; James Kevin Tillory Successor Trustee of the Arlister L Tillory and Mary E Tillory Trust Dated December 9, 2004. Refers to: Tillory, Arlister; Tillory, Mary; James Kevin Tillory Successor Trustee of the Arlister L Tillory and Mary E Tillory Trust Dated December 9, 2004; Tillory, James

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Clear Recon Corp; James Kevin Tillory Successor Trustee of the Arlister L Tillory and Mary E Tillory Trust Dated December 9, 2004. Refers to: Tillory, Arlister; Tillory, Mary; Tillory, James

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (of Petition to Superior Court to Deposit Surplus Funds) filed by Clear Recon Corp.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Clear Recon Corp.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Clear Recon Corp.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: OSC - Non-Sanction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Granted) filed by Tillory, James K. Filed By: Tillory, James K (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by Clear Recon Corp. Filed By: Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief - Other (Report of: Organized Crimes and Public Corruption) filed by Tillory, James K. Filed By: Tillory, James K (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Tillory, James K. Filed By: Tillory, James K (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Tillory, James K. Filed By: Tillory, James K (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOSC - Non-Sanction scheduled for 07/16/2021 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (ORDER T DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS) filed by Clear Recon Corp. Filed By: Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Petition to Superior Court to Deposit Surplus Funds) filed by Clear Recon Corp. Filed By: Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Clear Recon Corp. Filed By: Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Clear Recon Corp. Filed By: Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposits of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustees Sale filed by Clear Recon Corp; James Kevin Tillory Successor Trustee of the Arlister L Tillory and Mary E Tillory Trust Dated December 9, 2004. Refers to: Tillory, Arlister; Tillory, Mary; James Kevin Tillory Successor Trustee of the Arlister L Tillory and Mary E Tillory Trust Dated December 9, 2004; Tillory, James Filed By: Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Clear Recon Corp; James Kevin Tillory Successor Trustee of the Arlister L Tillory and Mary E Tillory Trust Dated December 9, 2004. Refers to: Tillory, Arlister; Tillory, Mary; Tillory, James Filed By: Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner); James Kevin Tillory Successor Trustee of the Arlister L Tillory and Mary E Tillory Trust Dated December 9, 2004 (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clear Recon Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RANKIN, CASPER J.