Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 07:20:35 (UTC).

Petition in Re: 10365 Moselle Street, San Diego CA 92131

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 Petition in Re 10365 Moselle Street, San Diego CA 92131 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants

Clear Recon Corp

Claimants

JPMorgan Chase Bank NA

Renovation Realty Inc

Robinson Jr, Stanley

Bowser Robinson, Cecile

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rankin, Casper J

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

 

Court Documents

Order - Other

Order - Other (Order to Deposit Surplus Funds) filed by Clear Recon Corp.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Notice of Order Depositing Surplus Funds and Notice of Hearing) filed by Clear Recon Corp.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposits of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustees Sale

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposits of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustees Sale filed by Clear Recon Corp; Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Clear Recon Corp; Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Clear Recon Corp; Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (of Petition to Superior Court to Deposit Surplus Funds) filed by Clear Recon Corp; Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Clear Recon Corp; Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Hearing on Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketReturned Mail (NOTICE OF ORDER DEPOSITING SURPLUS FUNDS AND NOTICE OF HEARING; NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED AT 429 SANDAL WOOD COURT ENCINITAS CA 92024) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Robinson, Stanley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketReturned Mail (re: Notice of Order Depositing Surplus Funds & Notice of Hearing as to Claimant; Hand Written Note on Enevelop: Does Not Live At This Address" P.O.Label: Return to Sender-Not Deliverable as Addressed-Unable to Forward) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Bowser Robinson, Cecile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketReturned Mail (NOTICE OF ORDER DEPOSITING SURPLUS FUNDS AND NOTICE OF HEARING; NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED AT PO BOX 11606 LEXINGTON KY 40576-1606) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of Order Depositing Surplus Funds and Notice of Hearing) filed by Clear Recon Corp. Filed By: Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order to Deposit Surplus Funds) filed by Clear Recon Corp. Filed By: Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposits of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustees Sale filed by Clear Recon Corp; Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants. Refers to: Robinson, Stanley; Bowser Robinson, Cecile; JPMorgan Chase Bank NA; Renovation Realty Inc Filed By: Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Clear Recon Corp; Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants. Filed By: Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner); Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Clear Recon Corp; Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants. Filed By: Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner); Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Petition to Superior Court to Deposit Surplus Funds) filed by Clear Recon Corp; Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants. Filed By: Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner); Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Clear Recon Corp; Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants. Filed By: Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner); Stanley Robinson Jr and Cecile Bowser Robinson husband and wife as joint tenants (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RENOVATION REALITY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Clear Recon Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RANKIN, CASPER J.