Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 10:28:49 (UTC).

Petition for Writ of Mandate of Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 Petition for Writ of Mandate of Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald L. Styn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald L. Styn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools

Respondents

Armstrong, Renita

Cleveland, Jerry

Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura

Bellflower Unified School District Board of Education

Cuadros, Debbie

Bellflower Unified School District

Downing, Richard

Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Zuniga, Alex

Saldana, Patrick

Attorney at LOS ANGELES COUNTY OFFICE OF EDUCATION

Andrade, Vibiana M

Respondent Attorney

Brady, Richard D

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC BATHEN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools. Refers to: Bellflower Unified School District; Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District; Bellflower Unified School District Board of Education; Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura; Armstrong, Renita; Downing, Richard; Cuadros, Debbie; Cleveland, Jerry

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

ADR Packet generated.

ADR Packet generated.

Minute Order RE: COURT ORDER

Minute Order RE: COURT ORDER

Incoming - Out of County Transfer - Case Contents

Incoming - Out of County Transfer - Case Contents filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction and Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order in the Alternative an Order Shortening Time

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petitioner s Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction and Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of ex parte application) filed by Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools.

Declaration of Nnenna Nkeiruka Benson in Support of Petitioner s OSC Re Preliminary Injunction and TRO

Declaration - Other (of Nnenna Kneiruka Benson in support of ex parte application) filed by Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools.

[Proposed] Order to Show Cause re Prelminary Injunction and TRO in the Alternative an Order Shortening Time in which to Hear OCS re Preliminary Injunction

Proposed Order submitted by Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools received but not filed on 11/09/2020.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other filed by Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other filed by Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/12/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Motion to Quash Subpoena

Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools.

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed by Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools.

Proposed Order on Ex Parte Application

Proposed Order (granting order on ex parte) submitted by Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools received but not filed on 02/08/2021.

Opposition - Other (Opposition & Replies)

Opposition - Other (to ex parte for order shortening time) filed by Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura; Armstrong, Renita; Downing, Richard; Cuadros, Debbie; Cleveland, Jerry; Bellflower Unified School District; Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District; Bellflower Unified School District Board of Education.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (of Eric Bathen in support of ex parte for order shortening time) filed by Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura; Armstrong, Renita; Downing, Richard; Cuadros, Debbie; Cleveland, Jerry; Bellflower Unified School District; Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District; Bellflower Unified School District Board of Education.

Request for Judicial Notice (Requests)

Request for Judicial Notice filed by Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura; Cuadros, Debbie; Cleveland, Jerry; Bellflower Unified School District; Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District; Bellflower Unified School District Board of Education.

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition - Other filed by Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura; Cuadros, Debbie; Cleveland, Jerry; Bellflower Unified School District; Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District; Bellflower Unified School District Board of Education. Filed By: Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura (Respondent); Cuadros, Debbie (Respondent); Cleveland, Jerry (Respondent); Bellflower Unified School District (Respondent); Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice filed by Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura; Cuadros, Debbie; Cleveland, Jerry; Bellflower Unified School District; Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District; Bellflower Unified School District Board of Education. Filed By: Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura (Respondent); Cuadros, Debbie (Respondent); Cleveland, Jerry (Respondent); Bellflower Unified School District (Respondent); Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura; Cuadros, Debbie; Cleveland, Jerry; Bellflower Unified School District; Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District; Bellflower Unified School District Board of Education. Filed By: Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura (Respondent); Cuadros, Debbie (Respondent); Cleveland, Jerry (Respondent); Bellflower Unified School District (Respondent); Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) continued pursuant to party's motion to 03/05/2021 at 09:00AM before Judge Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/10/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition - Other (to ex parte for order shortening time) filed by Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura; Armstrong, Renita; Downing, Richard; Cuadros, Debbie; Cleveland, Jerry; Bellflower Unified School District; Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District; Bellflower Unified School District Board of Education. Filed By: Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura (Respondent); Armstrong, Renita (Respondent); Downing, Richard (Respondent); Cuadros, Debbie (Respondent); Cleveland, Jerry (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Eric Bathen in support of ex parte for order shortening time) filed by Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura; Armstrong, Renita; Downing, Richard; Cuadros, Debbie; Cleveland, Jerry; Bellflower Unified School District; Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District; Bellflower Unified School District Board of Education. Filed By: Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura (Respondent); Armstrong, Renita (Respondent); Downing, Richard (Respondent); Cuadros, Debbie (Respondent); Cleveland, Jerry (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 12]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Correcting Court Record (ROA #13) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Stipulation to Transfer Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE SIGNED ON 08/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order RE: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue By Bellflower Unified School District

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed by Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools. Refers to: Bellflower Unified School District; Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District; Bellflower Unified School District Board of Education; Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura; Armstrong, Renita; Downing, Richard; Cuadros, Debbie; Cleveland, Jerry Filed By: Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools. Refers to: Bellflower Unified School District; Tracy Mcsparren Superintendent of Bellflower Unified School District; Bellflower Unified School District Board of Education; Sanchez-Ramirez, Laura; Armstrong, Renita; Downing, Richard; Cuadros, Debbie; Cleveland, Jerry Filed By: Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools. Filed By: Debra Duardo Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDRADE VIBIANA MARIA