This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 04:22:20 (UTC).

Petition for the matter of Dinorah Valenzuela

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 Petition for the matter of Dinorah Valenzuela was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kevin A. Enright. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kevin A. Enright

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litem and Petitioner

Quintana, Wendy

Claimant

Valenzuela, Dinorah

Defendants

State Farm Insurance

ROJAS, JOSE ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Guardian Ad Litem and Petitioner Attorney

Buchanan, Ryan

297 Santa Rosa St

San Luis Obispo, CA 93405

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

Notice to Litigants SD

Notice to Litigants SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct.

Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed by Quintana, Wendy. Refers to: Valenzuela, Dinorah; ROJAS, JOSE; State Farm Insurance

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor

Order Approving Compromise of Claim of Minor or Adult Person with Disability filed by Quintana, Wendy. Refers to: Valenzuela, Dinorah; ROJAS, JOSE; State Farm Insurance

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Quintana, Wendy. Refers to: Valenzuela, Dinorah; ROJAS, JOSE; State Farm Insurance

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Quintana, Wendy. Refers to: Valenzuela, Dinorah; ROJAS, JOSE; State Farm Insurance

Expedited Petition to Approve: Compromise of Disputed Claim (Minor)

Petition - Other filed by Quintana, Wendy. Refers to: Valenzuela, Dinorah; ROJAS, JOSE; State Farm Insurance

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Receipt and Acknowledgement of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account scheduled for 11/10/2020 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in 904 Kevin A. Enright was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed by Quintana, Wendy. Filed By: Quintana, Wendy (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re Order to Deposit SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Quintana, Wendy; Valenzuela, Dinorah. Filed By: Quintana, Wendy (Guardian Ad Litem); Valenzuela, Dinorah (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Claim of Minor or Adult Person with Disability filed by Quintana, Wendy; Valenzuela, Dinorah. Filed By: Quintana, Wendy (Guardian Ad Litem); Valenzuela, Dinorah (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed by Quintana, Wendy; Valenzuela, Dinorah. Filed By: Quintana, Wendy (Petitioner); Valenzuela, Dinorah (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Wendy Quintana) filed by Quintana, Wendy; Valenzuela, Dinorah. Filed By: Quintana, Wendy (Petitioner); Valenzuela, Dinorah (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/29/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/29/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice to Litigants SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPetition - Other filed by Quintana, Wendy. Refers to: Valenzuela, Dinorah; ROJAS, JOSE; State Farm Insurance Filed By: Quintana, Wendy (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Quintana, Wendy. Refers to: Valenzuela, Dinorah; ROJAS, JOSE; State Farm Insurance Filed By: Quintana, Wendy (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Quintana, Wendy. Refers to: Valenzuela, Dinorah; ROJAS, JOSE; State Farm Insurance Filed By: Quintana, Wendy (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Claim of Minor or Adult Person with Disability filed by Quintana, Wendy. Refers to: Valenzuela, Dinorah; ROJAS, JOSE; State Farm Insurance Filed By: Quintana, Wendy (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed by Quintana, Wendy. Refers to: Valenzuela, Dinorah; ROJAS, JOSE; State Farm Insurance Filed By: Quintana, Wendy (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCHANAN, RYAN