This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/26/2022 at 07:04:49 (UTC).

Petition for the Change of Name of Lia Jo Saraceno Alden

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 Petition for the Change of Name of Lia Jo Saraceno Alden was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno; AKA : Saraceno, Lia Jo;AKA : Flores, Lia Jo Saraceno;AKA : Saraceno Flores, Lia Jo

Oceanside, CA 92057

Respondent

Saraceno Flores, Lia Joe

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Petition for Change of Name

Petition for Change of Name filed by Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno. Refers to: Saraceno Flores, Lia

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno. Refers to: Saraceno Flores, Lia

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno. Refers to: Saraceno Flores, Lia

Proposed Decree Change Name

Proposed Decree Change Name filed by Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED IN WHOLE) filed by Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketHearing on Name Change scheduled for 11/22/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-25 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketThe Hearing on Name Change was rescheduled to 11/22/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in N-25 before at North County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED IN WHOLE) filed by Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno.; Filed By: Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Decree Change Name filed by Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno.; Filed By: Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketHearing on Name Change scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-25 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-25.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno. Refers to: Saraceno Flores, Lia; Filed By: Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno. Refers to: Saraceno Flores, Lia; Filed By: Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno. Refers to: Saraceno Flores, Lia; Filed By: Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name filed by Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno. Refers to: Saraceno Flores, Lia; Filed By: Alden, Lia Jo Saraceno (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less