This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/28/2023 at 07:02:33 (UTC).

Petition for Change of Name of Wintersteen

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Petition for Change of Name of Wintersteen was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wintersteen, Lillian Rae

Vista, CA 92083

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Petition for Change of Name

Petition for Change of Name filed by Wintersteen, Lillian Rae.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wintersteen, Lillian Rae.

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by Wintersteen, Lillian Rae.

Proposed Decree Change Name

Proposed Decree Change Name submitted by Wintersteen, Lillian Rae received but not filed on 11/29/2022.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Name Change heard 01/24/2023 08:30:00 AM.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Name Change heard 01/24/2023 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketHearing on Name Change scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-25 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketThe Hearing on Name Change was rescheduled to 01/24/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in N-25 before at North County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Decree Change Name submitted by Wintersteen, Lillian Rae received but not filed on 11/29/2022.; Filed By: Wintersteen, Lillian Rae (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketHearing on Name Change scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-25 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-25.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by Wintersteen, Lillian Rae.; Filed By: Wintersteen, Lillian Rae (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wintersteen, Lillian Rae.; Filed By: Wintersteen, Lillian Rae (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name filed by Wintersteen, Lillian Rae.; Filed By: Wintersteen, Lillian Rae (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less