This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 07:55:46 (UTC).

Persolve LLC vs. Jaron Lyon

Case Summary

On 10/01/2009 Persolve LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jaron Lyon. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERSOLVE LLC; DBA : ACCOUNT RESOLUTION ASSOCIATES

Defendant

LYON, JARON ; AKA : LYON, SPENCER JARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATTI-JELSVIK, ALAINE

9301 Winnetka Ave

Chatsworth, CA 91311

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party SD

Notice - Other (Stay of Proceedings) submitted by Persolve LLC rejected on 10/19/2011.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 09/02/2011 10:15:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Entry of Default submitted by Persolve LLC rejected on 08/31/2011. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 07/29/2011 10:15:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Persolve LLC rejected on 07/27/2011. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed was rescheduled to 07/29/2011 at 10:00:00 AM in E-21 before at East County.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Persolve LLC rejected on 06/09/2011. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Persolve LLC rejected on 03/21/2011. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Persolve LLC rejected on 08/04/2010. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Lyon, Jaron on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Persolve LLC .

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Entry of Default submitted by Persolve LLC rejected on 02/11/2010. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron

Notice of Voided Filing SD

Answer voided on 01/26/2010. Refers to: Persolve LLC

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Stay of Proceedings) submitted by Persolve LLC rejected on 10/19/2011. Filed By: Persolve LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 09/02/2011 10:15:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default submitted by Persolve LLC rejected on 08/31/2011. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron Filed By: Persolve LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • Docket08-22-2011 RECEIVED COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT PKG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed continued pursuant to party's motion to 09/02/2011 at 10:15AM in Department E-21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 07/29/2011 10:15:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court submitted by Persolve LLC rejected on 07/27/2011. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron Filed By: Persolve LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment (approved as to form only) filed by Persolve LLC. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron Filed By: Persolve LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default submitted by Persolve LLC rejected on 02/11/2010. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron Filed By: Persolve LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer voided on 01/26/2010. Refers to: Persolve LLC Filed By: Lyon, Jaron (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Lyon, Jaron. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron Filed By: Lyon, Jaron (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • DocketAnswer filed by Lyon, Jaron. Refers to: Persolve LLC Filed By: Lyon, Jaron (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • DocketCertificate of Service filed by Persolve LLC. Filed By: Persolve LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Persolve LLC. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron Filed By: Persolve LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Persolve LLC. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron Filed By: Persolve LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Department E-21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2009
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Persolve LLC. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron Filed By: Persolve LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2009
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Persolve LLC. Refers to: Lyon, Jaron Filed By: Persolve LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERSOLVE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA ACCOUNT RESOLUTION AS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASSOCIATE GENERAL COUNSEL - ALAINE PATTI-JELSVIK