This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/02/2023 at 08:46:12 (UTC).

Perez vs National Steel and Shipbuilding Company

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Perez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Perez, Humberto

Defendants

Chavez, Cesar

National Steel and Shipbuilding Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Begakis, Christina

11846 Ventura Boulevard 100

Studio City, CA 91604

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Perez, Humberto. Refers to: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company; Chavez, Cesar

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Perez, Humberto. Refers to: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company; Chavez, Cesar

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Perez, Humberto. Refers to: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company; Chavez, Cesar

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Perez, Humberto.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Perez, Humberto.; Filed By: Perez, Humberto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/04/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Perez, Humberto. Refers to: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company; Chavez, Cesar; Filed By: Perez, Humberto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Perez, Humberto. Refers to: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company; Chavez, Cesar; Filed By: Perez, Humberto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Perez, Humberto. Refers to: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company; Chavez, Cesar; Filed By: Perez, Humberto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less