This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/14/2020 at 01:35:52 (UTC).

Perez vs. Bodega Latina Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 Perez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bodega Latina Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Perez, Azucena

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Bodega Latina Corporation; DBA : El Super

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vega, Hector

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF HECTOR VEGA

178 S Victory Boulevard 109

Burbank, CA 91502

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Grant, Timothy J

Attorney at FREDRICKSON MAZEIKA & GRANT LLP

Thaeler, Kent H

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 01/08/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

Notice of Change of Attorney

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Bodega Latina Corporation.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Perez, Azucena. Refers to: Bodega Latina Corporation

Answer of Bodega Latina Corp. dba El Super

Answer filed by Bodega Latina Corporation. Refers to: Perez, Azucena

Cross-Complaint by Bodega Latina Corp. dba El Super

Cross-Complaint filed by Bodega Latina Corporation.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Bodega Latina Corporation.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/01/2019 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Perez, Azucena.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/06/2019 09:30:00 AM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 18)

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/06/2019 09:30:00 AM. (As Amended)

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Perez, Azucena. Refers to: Bodega Latina Corporation

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Perez, Azucena. Refers to: Bodega Latina Corporation

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial rescheduled to 01/08/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 12/11/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Bodega Latina Corporation. Filed By: Bodega Latina Corporation (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 08:30AM before Judge Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/12/2020 at 10:00AM before Judge Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketJury demanded by defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketThis matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Perez, Azucena. Filed By: Perez, Azucena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Perez, Azucena. Filed By: Perez, Azucena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Perez, Azucena. Refers to: Bodega Latina Corporation Filed By: Perez, Azucena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Perez, Azucena. Refers to: Bodega Latina Corporation Filed By: Perez, Azucena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Perez, Azucena. Refers to: Bodega Latina Corporation Filed By: Perez, Azucena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/06/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thaeler, Kent H

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANT TIMOTHY JOSEPH