This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/13/2018 at 01:38:20 (UTC).

Perez vs. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/19/2015 Perez filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE BACAL. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE BACAL

 

Party Details

Defendants

WARREN PUMPS INC

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

GARDNER DENVER INC

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

PATTERSON PUMP COMPANY

WEIL PUMP COMPANY INC

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMERICAN STANDARD INC

JOHN CRANE INC

ELLIOTT COMPANY

IMO INDUSTRIES INC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

VIKING PUMP INC

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BUFFALO PUMPS INC

CARRIER CORPORATION

THE SPENCER TURBINE COMPANY

VIAD CORP AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GRISCOM RUSSELL COMPANY

GOULDS PUMP (IPG) INC

TURBINE EQUIPMENT COMPANY

CBS CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO VIACOM INC FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

CALARESO, CHRISTINE D

GOLDBERG, A SCOTT

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

11766 Wilshire Boulevard 6Th F

Los Angeles, CA 90025

KANG, MIN K

11766 W 6Th St

Los Angeles, CA 90048

FLORES, JENNY-ANNE S.

515 S Flower St

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

GLEZAKOS, TINA M.

135 Main St

San Francisco, CA 94105

HARTLEY, JASON S

550 W C St #1750

San Diego, CA 92101

LANGBORD, PETER

REMILLARD, THOMAS W.

135 Main St

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Perez, Armando; Perez, Sylvia. Refers to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation; Bath Iron Works Corporation; Carrier Corporation; CBS CORPORATION; Crane Co; Elliott Company; Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation; Gardner Denver Inc; General Electric Company; Goulds Pump (IPG) Inc; IMO Industries Inc; Ingersoll-Rand Company; John Crane Inc; Patterson Pump Company; Pentair Inc; Rexnord Corporation; The Spencer Turbine Company; Turbine Equipment Company; VIKING PUMP INC; VIAD Corp; Warren Pumps Inc; Weil Pump Company Inc; Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor-in-interest to Buffalo Pumps Inc; CBS Corporation as successor-in-interest to Viacom Inc fka Westinghouse Electric; Crane Co as successor-in-interest to Chapman Valve Co and Deming Pumps; IMO Industries Inc as successor-in-interest to De Laval Steam Turbine Inc; Patterson Pump Company as successor-in-interest to CH Wheeler and Baldwin-Lima-Hamilton; Pentair Inc as successor-in-interest to Aurora Pump Company and Fairbanks Morse Pump Corporation; Rexnord Corporation as successor-in-interest to The Falk Corporation; Viad Corp as successor-in-interest to Griscom Russell Company; Warren Pumps Inc as successor-in-interest to Qumby Pump Company; Ingersoll-Rand Company as successor-in-interest to American Standard Inc; Aurora Pump Company

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Answer (with Proof of Service) submitted by Aurora Pump Company rejected on 12/09/2015.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Demand for Jury Trial submitted by Aurora Pump Company rejected on 12/09/2015.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Perez, Armando; Perez, Sylvia. Refers to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation; Bath Iron Works Corporation; Carrier Corporation; CBS CORPORATION; Crane Co; Elliott Company; Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation; Gardner Denver Inc; General Electric Company; Goulds Pump (IPG) Inc; IMO Industries Inc; Ingersoll-Rand Company; John Crane Inc; Patterson Pump Company; Pentair Inc; Rexnord Corporation; The Spencer Turbine Company; Turbine Equipment Company; VIKING PUMP INC; VIAD Corp; Warren Pumps Inc; Weil Pump Company Inc

Answer

Answer filed by VIAD Corp.

Add-On Petition for Coordination to LAOSD Asbestos Cases JCCP 4674

Notice - Other (Add-On Petition for Coordination to LAOSD Asbestos Cases JCCP 4674) filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Perez, Armando; Perez, Sylvia. Refers to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation; Bath Iron Works Corporation; Carrier Corporation; CBS CORPORATION; Crane Co; Elliott Company; Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation; Gardner Denver Inc; General Electric Company; Goulds Pump (IPG) Inc; IMO Industries Inc; Ingersoll-Rand Company; John Crane Inc; Patterson Pump Company; Pentair Inc; Rexnord Corporation; The Spencer Turbine Company; Turbine Equipment Company; VIKING PUMP INC; VIAD Corp; Warren Pumps Inc; Weil Pump Company Inc

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Crane Co.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Carrier Corporation.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Bath Iron Works Corporation.

Answer

Answer filed by Carrier Corporation.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial submitted by Aurora Pump Company rejected on 12/09/2015. Filed By: Aurora Pump Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (with Proof of Service) submitted by Aurora Pump Company rejected on 12/09/2015. Filed By: Aurora Pump Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Filed By: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Filed By: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Add-On Petition for Coordination to LAOSD Asbestos Cases JCCP 4674) filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Filed By: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Crane Co. Filed By: Crane Co (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Carrier Corporation. Filed By: Carrier Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/22/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by VIAD Corp. Filed By: VIAD Corp (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Carrier Corporation. Filed By: Carrier Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Bath Iron Works Corporation. Filed By: Bath Iron Works Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/22/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Perez, Armando; Perez, Sylvia. Refers to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation; Bath Iron Works Corporation; Carrier Corporation; CBS CORPORATION; Crane Co; Elliott Company; Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation; Gardner Denver Inc; General Electric Company; Goulds Pump (IPG) Inc; IMO Industries Inc; Ingersoll-Rand Company; John Crane Inc; Patterson Pump Company; Pentair Inc; Rexnord Corporation; The Spencer Turbine Company; Turbine Equipment Company; VIKING PUMP INC; VIAD Corp; Warren Pumps Inc; Weil Pump Company Inc Filed By: Perez, Armando (Plaintiff); Perez, Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Perez, Armando; Perez, Sylvia. Refers to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation; Bath Iron Works Corporation; Carrier Corporation; CBS CORPORATION; Crane Co; Elliott Company; Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation; Gardner Denver Inc; General Electric Company; Goulds Pump (IPG) Inc; IMO Industries Inc; Ingersoll-Rand Company; John Crane Inc; Patterson Pump Company; Pentair Inc; Rexnord Corporation; The Spencer Turbine Company; Turbine Equipment Company; VIKING PUMP INC; VIAD Corp; Warren Pumps Inc; Weil Pump Company Inc Filed By: Perez, Armando (Plaintiff); Perez, Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Perez, Armando; Perez, Sylvia. Refers to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation; Bath Iron Works Corporation; Carrier Corporation; CBS CORPORATION; Crane Co; Elliott Company; Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation; Gardner Denver Inc; General Electric Company; Goulds Pump (IPG) Inc; IMO Industries Inc; Ingersoll-Rand Company; John Crane Inc; Patterson Pump Company; Pentair Inc; Rexnord Corporation; The Spencer Turbine Company; Turbine Equipment Company; VIKING PUMP INC; VIAD Corp; Warren Pumps Inc; Weil Pump Company Inc; Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor-in-interest to Buffalo Pumps Inc; CBS Corporation as successor-in-interest to Viacom Inc fka Westinghouse Electric; Crane Co as successor-in-interest to Chapman Valve Co and Deming Pumps; IMO Industries Inc as successor-in-interest to De Laval Steam Turbine Inc; Patterson Pump Company as successor-in-interest to CH Wheeler and Baldwin-Lima-Hamilton; Pentair Inc as successor-in-interest to Aurora Pump Company and Fairbanks Morse Pump Corporation; Rexnord Corporation as successor-in-interest to The Falk Corporation; Viad Corp as successor-in-interest to Griscom Russell Company; Warren Pumps Inc as successor-in-interest to Qumby Pump Company; Ingersoll-Rand Company as successor-in-interest to American Standard Inc; Aurora Pump Company Filed By: Perez, Armando (Plaintiff); Perez, Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.