This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 10:10:22 (UTC).

Pena vs Ditech Financial LLC

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 Pena filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Ditech Financial LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pena, Kandice

Defendants

Ditech Financial LLC

Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rasmussen, Dennis

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DENNIS RASMUSSEN

680 E Colorado Blvd Suite 180

Pasadena, CA 91101

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Pena, Kandice. Refers to: Ditech Financial LLC; Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pena, Kandice. Refers to: Ditech Financial LLC; Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Pena, Kandice. Refers to: Ditech Financial LLC; Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Pena, Kandice rejected on 08/24/2022. Refers to: Ditech Financial LLC

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Pena, Kandice.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/06/2023 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Pena, Kandice .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ditech Financial LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Pena, Kandice.; Filed By: Pena, Kandice (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Pena, Kandice rejected on 08/24/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/06/2023 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Pena, Kandice. Refers to: Ditech Financial LLC; Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC; Filed By: Pena, Kandice (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pena, Kandice. Refers to: Ditech Financial LLC; Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC; Filed By: Pena, Kandice (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Pena, Kandice. Refers to: Ditech Financial LLC; Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC; Filed By: Pena, Kandice (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less