Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/03/2021 at 06:58:46 (UTC).

Pelayo vs Fukumoto

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 Pelayo filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Fukumoto. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pelayo, Mayra

Respondent

Fukumoto, Makun

Guardian Ad Litem

Gardner, Hideko

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRestraining order as requested against MAKUN FUKUMOTO was granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/14/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) filed by Pelayo, Mayra. Refers to: Fukumoto, Makun Filed By: Pelayo, Mayra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketResponse (Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders) filed by Pelayo, Mayra. Refers to: Fukumoto, Makun Filed By: Pelayo, Mayra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (GRANTED) filed by Gardner, Hideko. Refers to: Fukumoto, Makun Filed By: Gardner, Hideko (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketRespondent's (through Guardian Ad Litem) request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 02/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 01/24/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Pelayo, Mayra. Refers to: Fukumoto, Makun Filed By: Pelayo, Mayra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Pelayo, Mayra. Filed By: Pelayo, Mayra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Pelayo, Mayra. Refers to: Fukumoto, Makun Filed By: Pelayo, Mayra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pelayo, Mayra. Refers to: Fukumoto, Makun Filed By: Pelayo, Mayra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Pelayo, Mayra. Refers to: Fukumoto, Makun Filed By: Pelayo, Mayra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Pelayo, Mayra. Refers to: Fukumoto, Makun Filed By: Pelayo, Mayra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 01/24/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

    Read MoreRead Less