This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:26:24 (UTC).

Pedretti vs. Town Square M. Properties

Case Summary

On 03/13/2018 Pedretti filed an Other lawsuit against Town Square M Properties. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRAZIER. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRAZIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEDRETTI, SABRIYA

Defendants

MUSHARBASH, WILLIAM

TOWN SQUARE M. PROPERTIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TALKOV, SCOTT

Attorney at REID & HELLYER

3880 Lemon Street 5Th Floor

Riverside, CA 92501-1300

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pedretti, Sabriya. Refers to: Town Square M. Properties; Musharbash, William

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Pedretti, Sabriya. Refers to: Town Square M. Properties; Musharbash, William

Complaint

Complaint filed by Pedretti, Sabriya. Refers to: Town Square M. Properties; Musharbash, William

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pedretti, Sabriya. Refers to: Musharbash, William

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pedretti, Sabriya. Refers to: Town Square M. Properties

Notice of Motion for Change of Venue

Motion for Change of Venue (7/13/18) filed by Town Square M. Properties; Musharbash, William.

Stipulation to Transfer Venue and Proposed Order

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Town Square M. Properties; Musharbash, William.

Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD

Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD generated.

Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD

Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD generated.

Notice of Case Transmittal and Notice of Receipt of Transferred Case SD

Case file contents transferred to receiving court LOS ANGELES pursuant to court order.

Receipt - Other

Receipt - Other (Return Receipt for Certified Mail) filed by Pedretti, Sabriya.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt - Other (Return Receipt for Certified Mail) filed by Pedretti, Sabriya. Filed By: Pedretti, Sabriya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case file contents transferred to receiving court LOS ANGELES pursuant to court order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 07/13/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/17/2018 at 09:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Town Square M. Properties; Musharbash, William. Filed By: Town Square M. Properties (Defendant); Musharbash, William (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Change of Venue (7/13/18) filed by Town Square M. Properties; Musharbash, William. Filed By: Town Square M. Properties (Defendant); Musharbash, William (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 07/13/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pedretti, Sabriya. Refers to: Musharbash, William Filed By: Pedretti, Sabriya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pedretti, Sabriya. Refers to: Town Square M. Properties Filed By: Pedretti, Sabriya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/17/2018 at 09:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Summons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pedretti, Sabriya. Refers to: Town Square M. Properties; Musharbash, William Filed By: Pedretti, Sabriya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Pedretti, Sabriya. Refers to: Town Square M. Properties; Musharbash, William Filed By: Pedretti, Sabriya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Pedretti, Sabriya. Refers to: Town Square M. Properties; Musharbash, William Filed By: Pedretti, Sabriya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Town Square M Properties, LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Talkov, Scott H