This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/09/2018 at 07:50:41 (UTC).

PECK vs. THE RICHARDS GROUP

Case Summary

On 01/23/2015 PECK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE RICHARDS GROUP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE M. STERN. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE M. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peck, Michael

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

THE RICHARDS GROUP

Concepts in Construction Inc; AKA : Concepts in Concrete Construction, Inc.

County of San Diego; ESA : COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS

Concepts In Construction Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Le, An Van

Attorney at ANDY VAN LE & ASSOCIATES

401 West A Street 1615

San Diego, CA 92101

Le, Andy Van

Attorney at ANDY VAN LE & ASSOCIATES

401 W A Street 1615

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Carvalho, Jeffrey P

8989 Rio San Diego Dr #368

San Diego, CA 92108

HANCOCK, APRIL A

Attorney at ELARDO BRAGG & ROSSI PC

3001 E Camelback Rd Ste 130

Phoenix, AZ 85016

CORRELL, DEBRA A

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF HOLLINGSHEAD & ASSOCIATES

P O Box 293328

Sacramento, CA 95829-3328

Vilaseca, Christina I

Attorney at OFFICE OF COUNTY COUNSEL COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO

1600 Pacific Highway 355

San Diego, CA 92101

TODD, CHRISTOPHER W

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by THE RICHARDS GROUP.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Peck, Michael. Refers to: THE RICHARDS GROUP; County of San Diego; Concepts in Construction Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (County of San Diego, Department of Public Works) filed by Peck, Michael. Refers to: County of San Diego

Answer

Answer filed by THE RICHARDS GROUP.

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by Peck, Michael. Refers to: Concepts in Construction Inc

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (STIP AND ORDER TRANSFER ACTION FROM THE CENTRAL DIV TO NORTH CO DIV OF THE SD SUPERIOR COURT) filed by Peck, Michael.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to Jacqueline Stern effective 04/16/2015

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (Proof of Service of Summons) filed by Peck, Michael.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by County of San Diego.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by THE RICHARDS GROUP.

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery (03/04/2016) filed by Peck, Michael.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION 3-4-16) filed by Peck, Michael. Refers to: Concepts in Construction Inc

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Adela Medina, CSR No. 11964) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by THE RICHARDS GROUP.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by THE RICHARDS GROUP.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by County of San Diego.

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by THE RICHARDS GROUP. Filed By: THE RICHARDS GROUP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 09/16/2016 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 09/16/2016 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/01/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 07/29/2016 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - nonagreement filed by GLASS, DOUGLAS A. Filed By: GLASS, DOUGLAS A (Mediator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by THE RICHARDS GROUP. Filed By: THE RICHARDS GROUP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by THE RICHARDS GROUP. Filed By: THE RICHARDS GROUP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by County of San Diego. Filed By: County of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (The Richards Group) filed by Peck, Michael. Refers to: THE RICHARDS GROUP Filed By: Peck, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (County of San Diego, Department of Public Works) filed by Peck, Michael. Refers to: County of San Diego Filed By: Peck, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/26/2015 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Peck, Michael. Refers to: THE RICHARDS GROUP; County of San Diego Filed By: Peck, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Peck, Michael. Refers to: THE RICHARDS GROUP; County of San Diego Filed By: Peck, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Peck, Michael. Refers to: THE RICHARDS GROUP; County of San Diego; Concepts in Construction Inc Filed By: Peck, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.