This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/22/2018 at 21:35:35 (UTC).

Pearsall vs. Ramirez

Case Summary

On 11/21/2011 Pearsall filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ramirez. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-EC

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAVERTY, MARY ANN

KLOPSTEIN, JAMES S

PEARSALL, ANGELA

Defendants

SAN DIEGO ARCHITECTUAL METALS, INC.

RAMIREZ, RODOLFO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHASE, BRIAN

1301 Dove Street Ste 120

Newport Beach, CA 92660

GIBSON, ROBERT B

Attorney at GIBSON & HUGHES

1551 N Tustin Avenue Suite 530

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant Attorney

GENTES, STEPHEN A

Attorney at GENTES & ASSOCIATES

225 Broadway Suite 1500

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/13/2012 10:30:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Association of Attorney submitted by Pearsall, Angela; Laverty, Mary Ann; Klopstein, James S rejected on 04/11/2012.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/13/2012 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 04/13/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketStatus of Mediation process changed to Dismissed on 04/13/2012.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/25/2013 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 02/08/2013 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Pearsall, Angela; Klopstein, James S; Laverty, Mary Ann. Refers to: Ramirez, Rodolfo; San Diego Architectual Metals, Inc. Filed By: Pearsall, Angela (Plaintiff); Klopstein, James S (Plaintiff); Laverty, Mary Ann (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney filed by Pearsall, Angela; Laverty, Mary Ann; Klopstein, James S. Filed By: Pearsall, Angela (Plaintiff); Laverty, Mary Ann (Plaintiff); Klopstein, James S (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • DocketStatus of Mediation process changed to Pending mediation on 04/13/2012.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/13/2012 10:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketThis matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 04/13/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • DocketAnswer filed by Ramirez, Rodolfo; San Diego Architectual Metals, Inc..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pearsall, Angela. Refers to: Ramirez, Rodolfo Filed By: Pearsall, Angela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pearsall, Angela. Refers to: San Diego Architectual Metals, Inc. Filed By: Pearsall, Angela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pearsall, Angela; Laverty, Mary Ann; Klopstein, James S. Refers to: Ramirez, Rodolfo; San Diego Architectual Metals, Inc. Filed By: Pearsall, Angela (Plaintiff); Laverty, Mary Ann (Plaintiff); Klopstein, James S (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Pearsall, Angela; Laverty, Mary Ann; Klopstein, James S. Refers to: Ramirez, Rodolfo; San Diego Architectual Metals, Inc. Filed By: Pearsall, Angela (Plaintiff); Laverty, Mary Ann (Plaintiff); Klopstein, James S (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • DocketComplaint filed by Pearsall, Angela; Laverty, Mary Ann; Klopstein, James S. Refers to: Ramirez, Rodolfo; San Diego Architectual Metals, Inc. Filed By: Pearsall, Angela (Plaintiff); Laverty, Mary Ann (Plaintiff); Klopstein, James S (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GENTES, STEPHEN A