This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:49:19 (UTC).

PB Bay LLC vs DaDamoder P Reddy as Trustee of the Pati Family Trust DTD 5 17 1984 A&R 10 17 2012

Case Summary

On 01/28/2016 PB Bay LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DaDamoder P Reddy as Trustee of the Pati Family Trust DTD 5 17 1984 A R 10 17 2012. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W POLLACK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY W POLLACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PB BAY LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SOUMITRI P REDDY AS TRUSTEE OF THE PATI FAMILY TRUST DTD A&R

TICOR TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

DADAMODER P REDDY AS TRUSTEE OF THE PATI FAMILY TRUST DTD A&R

DAMODER P REDDY AS TRUSTEE OF THE PATI FAMILY TRUST DTD A&R

CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Cross Defendants

ASTORGA, YOLANDA

GUTIERREZ, LUIS

Silva, Isabel

ASTORGA, MARIA

WALKER, CIRILA ; AKA : TRUJILLO, CIRILA;AKA : TRUJILLO, C

ASTORGA, PIA

Five Star Escrow

LOPEZ GARCIA, HISO HIDET

Astorga, Yolanda ; AKA : Astorga, Yoli;AKA : Astorga-Lider, Yolanda;AKA : Lider, Yolanda;DBA : City Property Investments

LEIBY, MICHAEL ; DBA : MORTGAGE LOAN EXPERTS;DBA : Avant Capital Corporation

DELGADILLO, BENJAMIN

MADORA, JOSE

CHAIREZ, LEOVIGILDA

ALEJO, SECONO ; AKA : ALEJO, SOCORRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCKINLEY, RYAN O

Attorney at FREELAND MCKINLEY & MCKINLEY

16236 San Dieguito Rd

Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92091

MCKINLEY, STEVEN A

Attorney at FREELAND MCKINLEY & MCKINLEY

16236 San Dieguito Rd

Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92091

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HERSHBERGER, JOHN D

5872 Owens Ave

Carlsbad, CA 92008

RAGLAND, KAREN A

915 Wilshire Boulevard 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90017

LEE NOZAKI, JOSEPHINE C

Attorney at FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

915 Wilshire Boulevard 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90017

LEONHARDT, DONALD E

Attorney at FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

915 Whilshire Blvd Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Gruber, Allen M

Attorney at UNIVERSITY OF SAN DIEGO LEGAL CLINICS

Kinkead, Cary A

Attorney at ANDREWS LAGASSE BRANCH & BELL LLP

Keary, Grant C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/21/2018 01:30:00 PM.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. (As Amended)

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (For An Order Shortening Time) filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Damoder P Reddy as Trustee of the Pati Family Trust DTD 5 17 1984 A&R 10 17 2012; Soumitri P Reddy as Trustee of the Pati Family Trust DTD 5 17 1984 A&R 10 17 2012.

[proposed] Order for Leave of Court to Allow Cross -complainant Chicago Title Insurance Company to Take the Deposition of Cross-defendant Yolanda Astorga Aka Yolanda Lider, a Prisoner Confined in the California Institute for Women, Corona, Ca

Order - Other (for Leave of Court to Allow Cross-Complainant to Take the Deposition of Cross-Defendant (ORDER SIGNED 7/3/19) filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company.

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Gutierrez, Luis

Request for Entry of Default - Yolanda Astorga

Request for Entry of Default (DENIED) filed by Damoder P Reddy as Trustee of the Pati Family Trust DTD 5 17 1984 A&R 10 17 2012. Refers to: Astorga, Yolanda

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Affidavit - Other

Affidavit - Other filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company.

Opposition - Other

Opposition - Other (to Demurrer) filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Proof of Service re Notice of Posting of Undertaking re Preliminary Injunction

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Damoder P Reddy as Trustee of the Pati Family Trust DTD 5 17 1984 A&R 10 17 2012; Soumitri P Reddy as Trustee of the Pati Family Trust DTD 5 17 1984 A&R 10 17 2012.

First Paper - Other

First Paper - Other (Deft Ticor Title Company of California's Declaration of NON-MONETARY STATUS) filed by Ticor Title Company of California.

Affidavit of Due Diligence

Affidavit - Other filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (1ST) filed by PB Bay LLC. Refers to: Ticor Title Company of California; Damoder P Reddy as Trustee of the Pati Family Trust DTD 5 17 1984 A&R 10 17 2012; Soumitri P Reddy as Trustee of the Pati Family Trust DTD 5 17 1984 A&R 10 17 2012

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

161 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by CHAIREZ, LEOVIGILDA. Filed By: CHAIREZ, LEOVIGILDA (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (for Leave of Court to Allow Cross-Complainant to Take the Deposition of Cross-Defendant (ORDER SIGNED 7/3/19) filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company. Filed By: Chicago Title Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by WALKER, CIRILA. Filed By: WALKER, CIRILA (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Set Aside Default; Order) filed by TRUJILLO, C; PB Bay LLC. Filed By: WALKER, CIRILA (Cross - Defendant); PB Bay LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • The default has been vacated as to TRUJILLO, C listed on the Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order submitted by Chicago Title Insurance Company received but not filed on 06/07/2019. Filed By: Chicago Title Insurance Company (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/21/2019 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order submitted by Chicago Title Insurance Company received but not filed on 05/15/2019. Filed By: Chicago Title Insurance Company (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company. Filed By: Chicago Title Insurance Company (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (For An Order Shortening Time) filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company. Filed By: Chicago Title Insurance Company (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
199 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2016
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 03/15/2016 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (1ST) filed by PB Bay LLC. Refers to: Ticor Title Company of California; Chicago Title Insurance Company; Soumitri P Reddy as Trustee of the Pati Family Trust DTD 5 17 1984 A&R 10 17 2012 Filed By: PB Bay LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • First Paper - Other (Deft Ticor Title Company of California's Declaration of NON-MONETARY STATUS) filed by Ticor Title Company of California. Filed By: Ticor Title Company of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail filed by PB Bay LLC; PB Bay LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Pendency of Action filed by PB Bay LLC; PB Bay LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/01/2016 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PB Bay LLC. Refers to: Chicago Title Insurance Company; Ticor Title Company of California Filed By: PB Bay LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by PB Bay LLC. Refers to: Chicago Title Insurance Company; Ticor Title Company of California; Soumitri P Reddy as Trustee of the Pati Family Trust DTD 5 17 1984 A&R 10 17 2012 Filed By: PB Bay LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.