This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/24/2022 at 19:10:09 (UTC).

PAZER SPEAR VS COINBASE INC

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 PAZER SPEAR filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against COINBASE INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pazera Spear, Marilyn

Defendant

COINBASE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cardona Loya II, Octavio

Attorney at GOLDEN & CARDONA LOYA LLP

3130 Bonita Rd #200B

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Defendant Attorney

Totino, Edward D.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Pazera Spear, Marilyn. Refers to: COINBASE INC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pazera Spear, Marilyn. Refers to: COINBASE INC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Pazera Spear, Marilyn. Refers to: COINBASE INC

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Pazera Spear, Marilyn. Refers to: COINBASE INC

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to stay Civil Court Proceedings Pending Complaint of Arbitration) filed by COINBASE INC; Pazera Spear, Marilyn.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (to stay Civil Court Proceedings Pending Complaint of Arbitration) filed by COINBASE INC; Pazera Spear, Marilyn.; Filed By: COINBASE INC (Defendant); Pazera Spear, Marilyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Pazera Spear, Marilyn. Refers to: COINBASE INC; Filed By: Pazera Spear, Marilyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Pazera Spear, Marilyn. Refers to: COINBASE INC; Filed By: Pazera Spear, Marilyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pazera Spear, Marilyn. Refers to: COINBASE INC; Filed By: Pazera Spear, Marilyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Pazera Spear, Marilyn. Refers to: COINBASE INC; Filed By: Pazera Spear, Marilyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Coinbase, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cardona Loya II, Octavio