This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/18/2021 at 13:33:02 (UTC).

PAYDAR vs Paydar

Case Summary

On 03/09/2020 PAYDAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Paydar. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

PAYDAR, AKBAR

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Paydar, Rasoul

Paydar, Pooneh

PAYDAR, AKBAR

Paydar, Mehdi Mike

Access Development Group Inc

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Paydar, Pooneh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Dillon, Timothy P

Attorney at DILLON MILLER AHUJA & BOSS LLP

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Santana, Jason M

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JASON M SANTANA

Sharif, Yasaman

Dillon, Timothy P

Attorney at DILLON MILLER AHUJA & BOSS LLP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Sharif, Yasaman

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Paydar, Pooneh.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Paydar, Pooneh. Refers to: PAYDAR, AKBAR; Paydar, Rasoul; Paydar, Mehdi Mike; Access Development Group Inc

Declaration of Demurring Party In Support of Automatic Extension

Declaration - Other filed by PAYDAR, AKBAR.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Demurrer

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of demurrer to cross complaint) filed by PAYDAR, AKBAR.

Declaration In Support of Demurrer

Declaration - Other (of Timothy P Dillon in support of demurrer to cross complaint) filed by PAYDAR, AKBAR.

Motion to Strike Portions of Cross-Complaint

Motion to Strike filed by PAYDAR, AKBAR.

Declaration In Support of MTS

Declaration - Other (of Timothy P Dillon in support of motion to strike cross complaint) filed by PAYDAR, AKBAR.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by PAYDAR, AKBAR.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Paydar, Rasoul.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Paydar, Pooneh.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Paydar, Pooneh. Refers to: Paydar, Mehdi Mike

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Paydar, Pooneh. Refers to: Access Development Group Inc

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Paydar, Pooneh.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Of Pooneh Paydar) filed by Paydar, Pooneh.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Paydar, Pooneh.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (NOTICE TO THE COURT OF PENDING MOTION IN THE FAMILY COURT) filed by Paydar, Pooneh.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Cross-Complaint filed by Paydar, Pooneh. Refers to: Paydar, Rasoul; Paydar, Mehdi Mike; PAYDAR, AKBAR; Access Development Group Inc Filed By: Paydar, Pooneh (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (Cross Complaint) filed by Paydar, Pooneh. Filed By: Paydar, Pooneh (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 01/15/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Teri Smith #7949) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply filed by PAYDAR, AKBAR. Filed By: PAYDAR, AKBAR (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (TO THE COURT OF PENDING MOTION IN THE FAMILY COURT) filed by Paydar, Pooneh. Filed By: Paydar, Pooneh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (NOTICE TO THE COURT OF PENDING MOTION IN THE FAMILY COURT) filed by Paydar, Pooneh. Filed By: Paydar, Pooneh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 01/08/2021 at 11:00:00 AM in C-65 before Ronald F. Frazier at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2020 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by PAYDAR, AKBAR. Refers to: Paydar, Rasoul; Paydar, Pooneh Filed By: PAYDAR, AKBAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by PAYDAR, AKBAR. Refers to: Paydar, Rasoul; Paydar, Pooneh Filed By: PAYDAR, AKBAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by PAYDAR, AKBAR. Refers to: Paydar, Rasoul; Paydar, Pooneh Filed By: PAYDAR, AKBAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less