This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/25/2020 at 02:05:24 (UTC).

Pawnee Leasing Corporation vs CRM Vista INC [IMAGED[

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Pawnee Leasing Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CRM Vista INC IMAGED. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION

Defendants

CRM FRESH INC a California corporation

GRILLO, VINCENT FRANK; AKA : Grillo, Vincent F;AKA : Grillo, Vincent

CRM VISTA INC a California corporation; DBA : CARLSBAD RANCH MARKET

MATHESON, DOUGLAS ROBEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wittlin, Irwin M

Defendant Attorney

Chaudhry, Vik

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Counsel

Certificate of Counsel filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION. Refers to: CRM VISTA INC a California corporation; GRILLO, VINCENT; MATHESON, DOUGLAS; CRM FRESH INC a California corporation

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (3/13/2020) filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION.

Declaration in Support of Applications for Right to Attach Orders

Declaration - Other (3/13/2020) filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION.

Answer - Vincent Frank Grillo

Answer filed by GRILLO, VINCENT FRANK.

Answer - CRM Vista

Answer filed by CRM VISTA INC a California corporation.

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc.

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. (3/13/2020) filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION.

Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment

Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment (3/13/2020) filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/05/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment

Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment (3/13/2020) filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION. Refers to: GRILLO, VINCENT; CRM VISTA INC a California corporation; CRM FRESH INC a California corporation

Answer - CRM Fresh, Inc.

Answer filed by CRM FRESH INC a California corporation.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION. Refers to: CRM VISTA INC a California corporation; GRILLO, VINCENT; MATHESON, DOUGLAS; CRM FRESH INC a California corporation

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc.

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. (3/13/2020) filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION.

Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment

Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment (3/13/2020) filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc.

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. (3/13/2020) filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by CRM FRESH INC a California corporation. Filed By: CRM FRESH INC a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by CRM VISTA INC a California corporation. Filed By: CRM VISTA INC a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by GRILLO, VINCENT FRANK. Filed By: GRILLO, VINCENT FRANK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by CRM FRESH INC a California corporation; CRM VISTA INC a California corporation; GRILLO, VINCENT FRANK. Filed By: CRM FRESH INC a California corporation (Defendant); CRM VISTA INC a California corporation (Defendant); GRILLO, VINCENT FRANK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION. Refers to: GRILLO, VINCENT; CRM VISTA INC a California corporation; CRM FRESH INC a California corporation Filed By: PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment (3/13/2020) filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION. Filed By: PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. (3/13/2020) filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION. Filed By: PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment (3/13/2020) filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION. Filed By: PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. (3/13/2020) filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION. Filed By: PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment (3/13/2020) filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION. Filed By: PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2020
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/13/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/13/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION. Refers to: CRM VISTA INC a California corporation; GRILLO, VINCENT; MATHESON, DOUGLAS; CRM FRESH INC a California corporation Filed By: PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION. Refers to: CRM VISTA INC a California corporation; GRILLO, VINCENT; MATHESON, DOUGLAS; CRM FRESH INC a California corporation Filed By: PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Counsel filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION. Refers to: CRM VISTA INC a California corporation; GRILLO, VINCENT; MATHESON, DOUGLAS; CRM FRESH INC a California corporation Filed By: PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION. Refers to: CRM VISTA INC a California corporation; GRILLO, VINCENT; MATHESON, DOUGLAS; CRM FRESH INC a California corporation Filed By: PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/05/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.