This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/02/2022 at 01:30:01 (UTC).

PAUL KERTESZ vs. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 PAUL KERTESZ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KERTESZ, PAUL

Defendants

PNC MORTGAGE

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

GSAA HOME EQUITY TRUST 2007-6

GS MORTGAGE SECURITIES COMPANY

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION AND THEIR ASSIGNEES AND SUCCESSORS

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

PNC BANK NA; DBA : PNC MORTGAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BEALL, KELLY ANDREW

Attorney at WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

2301 Dupont Drive 300

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; PNC BANK NA; Wells Fargo Bank NA.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (For Dismissal of Action with Prejudice) filed by PNC BANK NA; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; Wells Fargo Bank NA.

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; PNC BANK NA; Wells Fargo Bank NA.

Order After Hearing

Order After Hearing (Order on Dftn's ex parte application for order dismissing Pltf's first amended complaint) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Judgment

Judgment filed by PNC BANK NA; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: KERTESZ, PAUL

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/22/2018 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Motion and Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Motion - Other (Motion for Terminating Sanctions) filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; PNC BANK NA; Wells Fargo Bank NA.

Notice of Continue Case Management Conference

Notice - Other (Of Continued Case Management Conference) filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; PNC MORTGAGE.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/11/2018 02:00:00 PM.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Lois Mason Thompson CSR 3685) filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 05/04/2018 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; PNC BANK NA; Wells Fargo Bank NA.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 04/27/2018 09:00:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Correspondence (Re: Legal representation) submitted by KERTESZ, PAUL rejected on 04/23/2018.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Non-Opposition to Discovery Motions

Notice - Other (Of Plaintiffs of Non-Opposition to Discovery Motions) filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; PNC BANK NA; Wells Fargo Bank NA.

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; PNC BANK NA; Wells Fargo Bank NA. Filed By: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY (Defendant); PNC BANK NA (Defendant); Wells Fargo Bank NA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/17/2018 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/03/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; PNC BANK NA; Wells Fargo Bank NA. Filed By: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY (Defendant); PNC BANK NA (Defendant); Wells Fargo Bank NA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder After Hearing (Order on Dftn's ex parte application for order dismissing Pltf's first amended complaint) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment filed by PNC BANK NA; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: KERTESZ, PAUL Filed By: PNC BANK NA (Defendant); DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY (Defendant); Wells Fargo Bank NA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY;PNC BANK NA;Wells Fargo Bank NA and against KERTESZ, PAUL for $ 0.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/22/2018 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketThe Ex Parte was rescheduled to 06/22/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 06/22/2018 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 03/09/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by PNC BANK NA. Filed By: PNC BANK NA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (TO SET ASIDE FORECLOSURE SALE) filed by KERTESZ, PAUL. Refers to: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; GSAA HOME EQUITY TRUST 2007-6; PNC MORTGAGE; PNC BANK NA; GS MORTGAGE SECURTIIES CORPORATION; GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE SECURITIES COMPANY; WELLS FARGO BANK NA QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION Filed By: KERTESZ, PAUL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by KERTESZ, PAUL. Refers to: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; GSAA HOME EQUITY TRUST 2007-6; PNC MORTGAGE; PNC BANK NA; GS MORTGAGE SECURTIIES CORPORATION; GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE SECURITIES COMPANY; WELLS FARGO BANK NA QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION Filed By: KERTESZ, PAUL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by KERTESZ, PAUL. Refers to: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; GSAA HOME EQUITY TRUST 2007-6; PNC MORTGAGE; PNC BANK NA; GS MORTGAGE SECURTIIES CORPORATION; GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE SECURITIES COMPANY; WELLS FARGO BANK NA QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION Filed By: KERTESZ, PAUL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/02/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by KERTESZ, PAUL. Refers to: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; GSAA HOME EQUITY TRUST 2007-6; PNC MORTGAGE; PNC BANK NA; GS MORTGAGE SECURTIIES CORPORATION; GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE SECURITIES COMPANY; WELLS FARGO BANK NA QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION Filed By: KERTESZ, PAUL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less