This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/12/2020 at 07:55:51 (UTC).

PATTEN vs DAVE & BUSTER'S OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 PATTEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against DAVE BUSTER'S OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE M. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE M. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PATTEN, JOSHUA

DESSIGNER, KIMBERLY

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DAVE & BUSTER'S OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

SUPER BOOTHS, INC.

GTEK MANUFACTURING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Movafagh, Chris

Attorney at MOVA LAW GROUP APLC

3262 Rosecrans St

San Diego, CA 92110

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WEISS, ERNEST L

Attorney at KLINEDINST PC

5 Hutton Center Dr Suite 1000

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Henderson, Austin R.

Londerholm, Andrew

Attorney at KLINEDINST PC

Molinari, David G

Attorney at FREEMAN MATHIS & GARY LLP

225 Broadway # 1460

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 02/05/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in N-27 before Jacqueline M. Stern at North County.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 03/05/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in N-27 before Jacqueline M. Stern at North County.

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

Association of Attorney filed by GTEK MANUFACTURING, LLC.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by GTEK MANUFACTURING, LLC.

Disassociation of Attorney

Disassociation of Attorney filed by GTEK MANUFACTURING, LLC.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (12/05/2019) filed by GTEK MANUFACTURING, LLC.

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by Dave & Buster's of California, Inc..

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Dave & Buster's of California, Inc..

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/05/2019 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by GTEK MANUFACTURING, LLC.

DAVE & BUSTER'S OF CALIFORNIA, INC.'S ANSWER TO GTEK TRANSPORTATION LLC dbA FUN COMPANY'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer (TO CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by Dave & Buster's of California, Inc..

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Dave & Buster's of California, Inc..

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Dave & Buster's of California, Inc..

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Dave & Buster's of California, Inc..

Answer

Answer (TO CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by GTEK MANUFACTURING, LLC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by GTEK MANUFACTURING, LLC.

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisassociation of Attorney filed by GTEK MANUFACTURING, LLC. Filed By: GTEK MANUFACTURING, LLC (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney filed by GTEK MANUFACTURING, LLC. Filed By: GTEK MANUFACTURING, LLC (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by GTEK MANUFACTURING, LLC. Filed By: GTEK MANUFACTURING, LLC (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 02/05/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in N-27 before Jacqueline M. Stern at North County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial rescheduled to 03/05/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in N-27 before Jacqueline M. Stern at North County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial continued pursuant to party's motion to 09/04/2020 at 08:30AM before Judge Jacqueline M. Stern.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to party's motion to 08/07/2020 at 10:00AM before Judge Jacqueline M. Stern.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/05/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Patten, Joshua; Dessigner, Kimberly. Filed By: Patten, Joshua (Plaintiff); Dessigner, Kimberly (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by Patten, Joshua; Dessigner, Kimberly. Refers to: Super Booths, Inc. Filed By: Patten, Joshua (Plaintiff); Dessigner, Kimberly (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Patten, Joshua; Dessigner, Kimberly. Refers to: Dave & Buster's of California, Inc. Filed By: Patten, Joshua (Plaintiff); Dessigner, Kimberly (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/03/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Patten, Joshua; Dessigner, Kimberly. Refers to: Dave & Buster's of California, Inc.; Super Booths, Inc. Filed By: Patten, Joshua (Plaintiff); Dessigner, Kimberly (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Patten, Joshua; Dessigner, Kimberly. Refers to: Dave & Buster's of California, Inc.; Super Booths, Inc. Filed By: Patten, Joshua (Plaintiff); Dessigner, Kimberly (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Patten, Joshua; Dessigner, Kimberly. Refers to: Dave & Buster's of California, Inc.; Super Booths, Inc. Filed By: Patten, Joshua (Plaintiff); Dessigner, Kimberly (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAVE & BUSTER'S OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant