This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/17/2019 at 20:16:56 (UTC).

PATRICIA A JENSEN CO TRUSTEE OF THE JENSEN FAMILY TRUST vs JENSEN [SHRIVER]

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 PATRICIA A JENSEN CO TRUSTEE OF THE JENSEN FAMILY TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JENSEN SHRIVER. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust

Defendant

Jensen, Jamie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garcia, Eduardo

Defendant Attorney

Marvel, James W

Attorney at LEGAL AID SOCIETY OF SAN DIEGO INC

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust. Refers to: Jensen, Jamie

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust. Refers to: Jensen, Jamie

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Original Summons

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust.

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (and All Unknown Occupants) filed by Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust. Refers to: Jensen, Jamie

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (and All Unknown Occupants) filed by Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust. Refers to: Jensen, Jamie

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust received but not filed on 05/13/2019. Refers to: Jensen, Jamie

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Jamie Jensen) filed by Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust. Refers to: Jensen, Jamie

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust.

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

[Another document for ROA# 16]

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

[Another document for ROA# 16]

Request for Entry of Default

[Another document for ROA# 16]

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises

[Another document for ROA# 16]

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

[Another document for ROA# 16]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Jensen, Jamie, on 06/03/2019, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Jensen, Jamie, on 06/03/2019, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust. Refers to: Jensen, Jamie Filed By: Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Assignment of Shriver Counsel filed by Jensen, Jamie. Filed By: Jensen, Jamie (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/05/2019 01:15:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 06/05/2019 at 01:15:00 PM at Central in C-60 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Jensen, Jamie. Filed By: Jensen, Jamie (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Jensen, Jamie. Filed By: Jensen, Jamie (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Jensen, Jamie. Filed By: Jensen, Jamie (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (and All Unknown Occupants) filed by Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust. Refers to: Jensen, Jamie Filed By: Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust. Filed By: Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Case assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust. Refers to: Jensen, Jamie Filed By: Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust. Refers to: Jensen, Jamie Filed By: Patricia A Jensen Co Trustee of the Jensen Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PATRICIA A LODGE QUALIFIED PERSONAL RESIDENCE TRUST DATED JUNE 14 2012 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Warren Marvel