This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/22/2020 at 01:01:54 (UTC).

Patak vs Carlsbad Shores LLC

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Patak filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Carlsbad Shores LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patak, Nahrien

Defendants

Carlsbad Shores LLC

Hannah-Shmouni Properties LLC

Hannah-Shmouni Investments LLC

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal (Hannah-Shmouni Properties LLC) filed by Patak, Nahrien. Refers to: Hannah-Shmouni Properties LLC

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (Hannah-Shmouni Investments LLC) filed by Patak, Nahrien. Refers to: Hannah-Shmouni Investments LLC

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Carlsbad Shores LLC. Refers to: Hannah-Shmouni Properties LLC; Hannah-Shmouni Investments LLC; Carlsbad Shores LLC

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Patak, Nahrien.

Interpreter Request

Interpreter Request (Arabic) filed by Patak, Nahrien.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (Hannah-Shmouni Investments LLC) filed by Patak, Nahrien. Refers to: Hannah-Shmouni Investments LLC Filed By: Patak, Nahrien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal (Hannah-Shmouni Properties LLC) filed by Patak, Nahrien. Refers to: Hannah-Shmouni Properties LLC Filed By: Patak, Nahrien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Carlsbad Shores LLC. Refers to: Hannah-Shmouni Properties LLC; Hannah-Shmouni Investments LLC; Carlsbad Shores LLC Filed By: Patak, Nahrien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Carlsbad Shores LLC. Filed By: Patak, Nahrien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 05/20/2020 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Patak, Nahrien. Filed By: Patak, Nahrien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterpreter Request (Arabic) filed by Patak, Nahrien. Filed By: Patak, Nahrien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.