This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/14/2021 at 22:23:58 (UTC).

PASTOR OF SAINT PATRICK CATHOLIC PARISH CARLSBAD IN CARLSBAD CALIFORNIA vs CERTIFIED CONCRETE

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 PASTOR OF SAINT PATRICK CATHOLIC PARISH CARLSBAD IN CARLSBAD CALIFORNIA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CERTIFIED CONCRETE. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald L. Styn and Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ronald L. Styn

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PASTOR OF SAINT PATRICK CATHOLIC PARISH CARLSBAD IN CARLSBAD CALIFORNIA; AKA : PASTOR OF SAINT PATRICK PARISH CARLSBAD IN CARLSBAD CALIFORNIA;AKA : PASTOR OF ST PATRICK CARLSBAD IN CARLSBAD CALIFORNIA

The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Diego

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CHALLENGER SHEET METAL

PICTURE PERFECT WINDOWS & DOORS

VISION HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC

CLEAVENGER MASONRY INC

VORWALLER & BROOKS INC

WICR INC

QUALITY REINFORCING INC

KOLOA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION INC

CERTIFIED CONCRETE INC

RAP ENGINEERING INC

LOZANOS CONSTRUCTION

SCW CONTRACTING CORPORATION

WICR Waterproofing and Construction Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edwards, Lucas A

1650 Hotel Circle North 200

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SMIGLIANI, SUZANNE L

6265 Greenwich Drive Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92122

Harris, Charles

DICARLANTONIO, DONNA M

Attorney at STREAM KIM HICKS WRAGK & ALFARO PC

3403 Tenth Street 700

Riverside, CA 92501

Reden, Justin

16885 Via Del Campo Court 320

San Diego, CA 92127

Monroe, Scott W.

Attorney at MESSNER REEVES LLP

650 Town Center Drive 700

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Liedle, Matthew J

Attorney at LIEDLE & LARSON LLP

12520 High Bluff Drive 200

San Diego, CA 92130

Lawrence, Lisa I

21680 Gateway Center Drive Suite 100

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Norris, Suzanne T

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A HAUSER One Pointe Drive

1 Pointe Drive 6Th Floor

Brea, CA 92821

Nagpal, Vik

760 Garden View Court 100

Encinitas, CA 92024

Van, Ronald P.

Skane, Elizabeth A

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint

Answer (to plaintiffs complaint) filed by SCW CONTRACTING CORPORATION.

Answer to Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by SCW CONTRACTING CORPORATION.

Original Summons on cross-complaint

Original Summons filed by SCW CONTRACTING CORPORATION.

Answer

Answer filed by VISION HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC.

Answer

Answer filed by CLEAVENGER MASONRY INC.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by CLEAVENGER MASONRY INC.

Original Summons

Original Summons (Cross Complaint) filed by CLEAVENGER MASONRY INC.

Answer

Answer filed by QUALITY REINFORCING INC.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by QUALITY REINFORCING INC.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by LOZANOS CONSTRUCTION.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by RAP ENGINEERING INC.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Diego; PASTOR OF SAINT PATRICK CATHOLIC PARISH CARLSBAD IN CARLSBAD CALIFORNIA.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by VISION HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by SCW CONTRACTING CORPORATION.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by LOZANOS CONSTRUCTION.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by LOZANOS CONSTRUCTION.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by CERTIFIED CONCRETE INC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by CERTIFIED CONCRETE INC.

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Status Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/29/2022 at 11:00AM before Judge Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/12/2021 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by CHALLENGER SHEET METAL. Filed By: CHALLENGER SHEET METAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by SCW CONTRACTING CORPORATION. Filed By: SCW CONTRACTING CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by PICTURE PERFECT WINDOWS & DOORS. Filed By: PICTURE PERFECT WINDOWS & DOORS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by RAP ENGINEERING INC. Filed By: RAP ENGINEERING INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by WICR Waterproofing and Construction Inc. Filed By: WICR Waterproofing and Construction Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by WICR Waterproofing and Construction Inc. Filed By: WICR Waterproofing and Construction Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Katz, Keri for 09/17/2021 at 10:30:00 AM in C-74 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by PASTOR OF SAINT PATRICK CATHOLIC PARISH CARLSBAD IN CARLSBAD CALIFORNIA; The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Diego. Refers to: CERTIFIED CONCRETE INC; CHALLENGER SHEET METAL; CLEAVENGER MASONRY INC; KOLOA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION INC; LOZANOS CONSTRUCTION; PICTURE PERFECT WINDOWS & DOORS; QUALITY REINFORCING INC; RAP ENGINEERING INC; SCW CONTRACTING CORPORATION; VISION HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC; VORWALLER & BROOKS INC; WICR INC; WICR Waterproofing and Construction Inc Filed By: PASTOR OF SAINT PATRICK CATHOLIC PARISH CARLSBAD IN CARLSBAD CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Diego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by PASTOR OF SAINT PATRICK CATHOLIC PARISH CARLSBAD IN CARLSBAD CALIFORNIA; The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Diego. Refers to: CERTIFIED CONCRETE INC; CHALLENGER SHEET METAL; CLEAVENGER MASONRY INC; KOLOA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION INC; LOZANOS CONSTRUCTION; PICTURE PERFECT WINDOWS & DOORS; QUALITY REINFORCING INC; RAP ENGINEERING INC; SCW CONTRACTING CORPORATION; VISION HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC; VORWALLER & BROOKS INC; WICR INC Filed By: PASTOR OF SAINT PATRICK CATHOLIC PARISH CARLSBAD IN CARLSBAD CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Diego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by PASTOR OF SAINT PATRICK CATHOLIC PARISH CARLSBAD IN CARLSBAD CALIFORNIA; The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Diego. Refers to: CERTIFIED CONCRETE INC; CHALLENGER SHEET METAL; CLEAVENGER MASONRY INC; KOLOA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION INC; LOZANOS CONSTRUCTION; PICTURE PERFECT WINDOWS & DOORS; QUALITY REINFORCING INC; RAP ENGINEERING INC; SCW CONTRACTING CORPORATION; VISION HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC; VORWALLER & BROOKS INC; WICR INC Filed By: PASTOR OF SAINT PATRICK CATHOLIC PARISH CARLSBAD IN CARLSBAD CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); The Roman Catholic Bishop of San Diego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WICR INC is a litigant

Latest cases where VORWALLER & BROOKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LOZANOS CONSTRUCTION is a litigant