This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 21:59:50 (UTC).

Park Terrace Development LP vs AIG Specialty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/19/2014 Park Terrace Development LP filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AIG Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOEL M. PRESSMAN and KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOEL M. PRESSMAN

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Carlyle Park Terrace GP LLC

PARK TERRACE DEVELOPMENT LP

AIG SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; AKA : CHARTIS INC;FKA : AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL SPECIALTY LINES INSURANCE COMPANY INC

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SERIES OF LOCKTON COMPANIES; DBA : LOCKTON INSURANCE AGENCY AND LOCKTON INSURANCE BROKERS

LOCKTON INSURANCE BROKERS INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

A&D Fire Protection Inc

AIG Specialty Insurance Company; FKA : American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company Inc

Brian Cox Mechanical Inc

Commercial & Industrial Roofing Co Inc

Courtney Inc; DBA : Courtney Waterproofing

DA Whitacre Construction Inc

DFS Flooring Inc

Ehmcke Sheet Metal Corp

HARRIS/ARIZONA REBAR INC

Aig Specialty Insurance Company

SMG STONE COMPANY INC

AIG SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; AKA : CHARTIS INC;FKA : AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL SPECIALTY LINES INSURANCE COMPANY INC

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SERIES OF LOCKTON COMPANIES; DBA : LOCKTON INSURANCE AGENCY AND LOCKTON INSURANCE BROKERS

SPOONER'S WOODWORKS INC

SURECRAFT SUPPLY INC

LYONS MASONRY INC

LOCKTON INSURANCE BROKERS INC

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MASTERS, JEFFREY D; MUSITANO, JOHN; McGovern, Patrick M

Attorney at COX CASTLE & NICHOLSON

2049 Century Park East 28Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

MASTERS, JEFFREY D

Attorney at NICOLAIDES FINK THORPE MICHAELIDES SULLIVAN L

800 Wilshire Blvd #860

Los Angeles, CA 90017

MUSITANO, JOHN

MCGOVERN, PATRICK M

MANFREDI, SETH J

626 Wilshire Boulevard 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

BULLARD, JAMES E

234 E Commonwealth Ave

Fullerton, CA 92832

KO, HAE WON

234 E Commonwealth Ave

Fullerton, CA 92832

GERSCHLER, ANTON C

Attorney at NORTH COUNTY LAW FIRM

6824 Embarcadero Ln

Carlsbad, CA 92011

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

MANFREDI, SETH J

626 Wilshire Boulevard 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

BULLARD, JAMES E

234 E Commonwealth Ave

Fullerton, CA 92832

KO, HAE WON

234 E Commonwealth Ave

Fullerton, CA 92832

GERSCHLER, ANTON C

Attorney at NORTH COUNTY LAW FIRM

6824 Embarcadero Ln

Carlsbad, CA 92011

CAULEY, KEVIN T

Attorney at SCHWARTZ SEMERDJIAN CAULEY & MOOT LLP

101 W Broadway 810

San Diego, CA 92101

PARK, JAE K

MCCUTCHEON, STEPHEN R JR

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CAULEY, KEVIN T

Attorney at SCHWARTZ SEMERDJIAN CAULEY & MOOT LLP

101 W Broadway 810

San Diego, CA 92101

Other Attorneys

HAVERKAMP, ALBERT E

4350 Executive Dr #260

San Diego, CA 92121

LIEBER, MEGAN K

FANNING, CHARLES L. IV

Attorney at OLIVA & FANNING ALC

Bernardo Plaza Ct

San Diego, CA 92128

BUCHANAN, NATASHA K

Attorney at LANAK & HANNA PC

190 The City Dr S

Orange, CA 92868

LANAK, FRANCIS

FAIRCLOTH, MICHAEL S

Attorney at OLIVA & FANNING ALC

Bernardo Plaza Ct

San Diego, CA 92128

BARBER, BRYAN M

Attorney at BARBER LAW GROUP

600 University Ave

Palo Alto, CA 94301

SLOAN, KELLY C.

MCCARTHY, COLIN K

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer (to Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed by AIG Specialty Insurance Company. Refers to: Morley Construction Company

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

[Another document for ROA# 138]

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Answer

Answer filed by AIG Specialty Insurance Company.

Reply

Reply filed by Brian Cox Mechanical Inc.

Answer

Answer filed by Sherwood Mechanical Inc.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice filed by AIG Specialty Insurance Company.

Answer

Answer filed by Helix Electric Inc. Refers to: ISD Realty Inc

Swinerton Builders' Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Swinerton Builders; Swinerton Builders.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Opposition to Southern California Series of Lockton Companies dba Lockton Insurance Agency and Lockton Insurance Brokers Demurrer to The First Amended Complaint of Swinerton Builders) filed by Swinerton Builders.

of Evidence in Support of Opposition

Statement - Other (of Evidence in Support of Opposition) filed by AIG Specialty Insurance Company.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Morley Construction Company.

Declaration of George Ruhlen

Declaration - Other (Declaration of George Ruhlen) filed by Park Terrace Development LP; ISD Realty Inc; Carlyle Park Terrace GP LLC.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions (The third and fourth causes of action against Swinerton ONLY) filed by Morley Construction Company.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Carlyle Park Terrace GP LLC; ISD Realty Inc; Park Terrace Development LP.

Motion for Reconsideration

Motion for Reconsideration filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SERIES OF LOCKTON COMPANIES LLC.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 307]

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Swinerton Builders.

596 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • Amended Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to AIG Specialty Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Amended Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Swinerton Builders.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Amended Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Park Terrace Development LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Amended Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Morley Construction Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Amended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Carlyle Park Terrace GP LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Amended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to ISD Realty Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Amended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Park Terrace Development LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Amended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to HARRIS/ARIZONA REBAR INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Amended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Amended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
832 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to PCS Contracting Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (ENTERED) filed by Park Terrace Development LP; ISD Realty Inc; Carlyle Park Terrace GP LLC. Refers to: PCS Contracting Inc Filed By: Park Terrace Development LP (Plaintiff); ISD Realty Inc (Plaintiff); Carlyle Park Terrace GP LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/03/2015 at 10:10:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/03/2015 at 10:10:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by ISD Realty Inc; Park Terrace Development LP. Refers to: AIG Specialty Insurance Company; Swinerton Builders; A&D Fire Protection Inc; Brian Cox Mechanical Inc; Commercial & Industrial Roofing Co Inc; Courtney Inc; DA Whitacre Construction Inc; DFS Flooring Inc; Ehmcke Sheet Metal Corp; HARRIS/ARIZONA REBAR INC; Helix Electric Inc; Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc; Lyons Masonry Inc; Masco Contractor Services of California Inc; Morley Construction Company; Mufasa Inc; PCS Contracting Inc; Sherwood Mechanical Inc; SMG Stone Company Inc; Spooner's Woodworks Inc; Stoney Creek Cabinet Company Inc; Surecraft Supply Inc; Wirtz Tile & Stone Inc Filed By: ISD Realty Inc (Plaintiff); Park Terrace Development LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by ISD Realty Inc; Park Terrace Development LP. Refers to: AIG Specialty Insurance Company; Swinerton Builders; A&D Fire Protection Inc; Brian Cox Mechanical Inc; Commercial & Industrial Roofing Co Inc; Courtney Inc; DA Whitacre Construction Inc; DFS Flooring Inc; Ehmcke Sheet Metal Corp; HARRIS/ARIZONA REBAR INC; Helix Electric Inc; Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc; Lyons Masonry Inc; Masco Contractor Services of California Inc; Morley Construction Company; Mufasa Inc; PCS Contracting Inc; Sherwood Mechanical Inc; SMG Stone Company Inc; Spooner's Woodworks Inc; Stoney Creek Cabinet Company Inc; Surecraft Supply Inc; Wirtz Tile & Stone Inc Filed By: ISD Realty Inc (Plaintiff); Park Terrace Development LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by ISD Realty Inc; Park Terrace Development LP; Carlyle Park Terrace GP LLC. Refers to: AIG Specialty Insurance Company; Swinerton Builders; A&D Fire Protection Inc; Brian Cox Mechanical Inc; Commercial & Industrial Roofing Co Inc; Courtney Inc; DA Whitacre Construction Inc; DFS Flooring Inc; Ehmcke Sheet Metal Corp; HARRIS/ARIZONA REBAR INC; Helix Electric Inc; Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc; Lyons Masonry Inc; Masco Contractor Services of California Inc; Morley Construction Company; Mufasa Inc; PCS Contracting Inc; Sherwood Mechanical Inc; SMG Stone Company Inc; Spooner's Woodworks Inc; Stoney Creek Cabinet Company Inc; Surecraft Supply Inc; Wirtz Tile & Stone Inc Filed By: ISD Realty Inc (Plaintiff); Park Terrace Development LP (Plaintiff); Carlyle Park Terrace GP LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.