This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/24/2018 at 23:08:17 (UTC).

PARK PLACE ON HARBOR DRIVE vs. Bosa Development California Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2009 PARK PLACE ON HARBOR DRIVE filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Bosa Development California Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Cross Plaintiff, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA INC

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

PAUL HANSEN EQUIPMENT INC

TB PENICK & SONS INC; AKA : CONCRETE SCIENCE OF SAN DIEGO

HASSON PAINTING CONTRACTORS INC; AKA : RM HASSON INC

PROGRESSIVE STEEL FABRICATORS INC

NEWWAY STRUCTURES INC; ESA : NEWAY STRUCTURES INC

STANDARD PLUMBING & INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY CO

ATLAS MECHANICAL INC

KAMMERER ENTERPRISES INC; DBA : AMERICAN MARBLE INC

WILLIAM KELLY & SONS CALIFORNIA INC

ALCALA COMPANY INC

THE CITY OF SAN DIEGO

CREATIVE GLASS DESIGNS INC

PETER ROSS CA INC; ESA : PETER ROSS CALIFORNIA INC

HIGHTOWER FINISHING INC

BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA INC

STANDARD PLUMBING & INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY

PACIFIC COAST IRON

THE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA

SPATT EMANUEL ENGINEERING; AKA : GORDON SPRATT & ASSOCIATES

J R COUSIN INTERNATIONAL LTD; DBA : PACIFIC IRON OF AMERICA;ESA : J R COUSIN INTERNATIONAL LTD

84 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

LIN, ARTHUR Y

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

CZELUSNIAK, DAVID E

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

650 W Macarthur Blvd

Santa Ana, CA 92707

STEVENS, DAVID A

NAGPAL, VIK

VREVICH, BARRY M

TEMPLETON JR, ROBERT R

MOORE, DONNA

EGAN, CHARLES K

Attorney at LINCOLN GUSTAFSON & CRECOS

225 Broadway Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

LIN, ARTHUR Y

Other Attorneys

FLAHERTY, DOUGLAS P

SMIGLIANI, PAUL W

CAHILL, SEAN T

Attorney at CAHILL & ASSOCIATES

402 W Broadway 1925

San Diego, CA 92101

TYLER, BRANDY P

BOND, CARY R

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CARY RICHARD BOND APC

501 West Broadway # 1660

San Diego, CA 92101

NASH, TIMOTHY J

TANNENBAUM, OZ

EDWARDS, MICHAEL M

Attorney at BYRON & EDWARDS APC

402 W Broadway 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

LEBOFF, MICHAEL S

CERCOS, THEODORE R

Attorney at LINCOLN GUSTAFSON & CERCOS LLP

550 W C Street 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

SKANE, ELIZABETH A

KANEDA, JOSEPH

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 04/27/17 - volume 2 of 2

Case File Contents as of 04/27/17 - volume 2 of 2

Case File Contents as of 05/16/17 - volume 1 of 2

Case File Contents as of 05/16/17 - volume 1 of 2

Notice to Filing Party SD

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation submitted by Bosa Development California Inc. rejected on 01/27/2010.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Entry of Default submitted by Bosa Development California Inc. rejected on 02/10/2010. Refers to: Creative Glass Designs Inc

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Entry of Default submitted by Bosa Development California Inc. rejected on 02/10/2010. Refers to: Creative Glass Designs Inc

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/04/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/11/2010 09:15:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 04/23/2010 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Peter Ross California Inc on Cross-Complaint filed by Bosa Development California Inc. .

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Creative Glass Designs Inc on Cross-Complaint filed by Bosa Development California Inc. .

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Entry of Default submitted by Bosa Development California Inc. rejected on 03/17/2010. Refers to: Creative Glass Designs Inc

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 04/23/2010 10:30:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Peter Ross California Inc on Cross-Complaint filed by Bosa Development California Inc. .

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 06/11/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 08/26/2011 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

Notice of Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/19/2011 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/08/2010 09:00:00 AM.

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 05/16/17 - volume 1 of 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 04/27/17 - volume 2 of 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to El Cajon Grading & Engineering Co Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • Petition - Other dismissed without prejudice as to Kammerer Enterprises Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Paul Hansen Equipment Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Newway Structures Inc. Filed By: Newway Structures Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Peter Ross CA Inc. Filed By: Peter Ross CA Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Hightower Finishing Inc. Filed By: Hightower Finishing Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Bosa Development California Inc. Filed By: Bosa Development California Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
657 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2009
  • Certificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (as to 14 cross-defendants - court grants to 02/01/10) filed by Bosa Development California Inc.. Filed By: Bosa Development California Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2009
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Bosa Development California Inc.. Refers to: Alcala Company Inc; American Air Balance; Kammerer Enterprises Inc; Atlas Mechanical Inc; Aztec Sheet Metal Inc; Benchmark Landscape Inc; Brady Company/San Diego Inc; Claddagh Paving Corporation; Claddagh Paving Corporation; CM Firestop Inc; Creative Glass Designs Inc; Great Western Tile Corporation; Guardian Building Products Distribution Inc; Hanson Aggregates West Inc; Hasson Painting Contractors Inc; Hightower Finishing Inc; Malcom Drilling Company Inc; Mission Pools of Escondido Inc; Pablo Leyden Corporation; Paul Hansen Equipment Inc; Peter Ross CA Inc; Progressive Steel Fabricators Inc; Southland Electric Inc; Starline Windows Inc; TB Penick & Sons Inc; Western Fire Protection Inc; William Kelly & Sons California Inc; Arnold Nemetz and Associates; Christian Wheeler Engineering; Dikeakos & Cotter Architects; Garbini & Garbini Landscape Architects; Mcparlane & Associates; Neiderhaus, Milton; Sterling Coopers & Associates; Spatt Emanuel Engineering; Malcolm Drilling Company Inc; Newway Structures Inc; Bristol Fiberlite Industries Inc; MCPARLANE & ASSOCIATES; Sterling Cooper & Associates; El Cajon Grading & Engineering; Standard Plumbing & Industrial Supply; Standard Plumbing & Industrial Supply Co; Kaylake Industries Inc; Potter Roemer LLC Filed By: Bosa Development California Inc (Cross - Complainant); Bosa Development California Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2009
  • Answer filed by Bosa Development California Inc.. Refers to: PARK PLACE ON HARBOR DRIVE OWNERS ASSOCIATION Filed By: Bosa Development California Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2009
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by PARK PLACE ON HARBOR DRIVE OWNERS ASSOCIATION. Refers to: Bosa Development California Inc Filed By: PARK PLACE ON HARBOR DRIVE OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PARK PLACE ON HARBOR DRIVE OWNERS ASSOCIATION. Refers to: Bosa Development California Inc Filed By: PARK PLACE ON HARBOR DRIVE OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • Original Summons filed by PARK PLACE ON HARBOR DRIVE OWNERS ASSOCIATION. Refers to: Bosa Development California Inc Filed By: PARK PLACE ON HARBOR DRIVE OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • Complaint filed by PARK PLACE ON HARBOR DRIVE OWNERS ASSOCIATION. Refers to: Bosa Development California Inc; Alcala Company Inc; American Air Balance; Atlas Mechanical Inc; Aztec Sheet Metal Inc; Benchmark Landscape Inc; Brady Company/San Diego Inc; Claddagh Paving Corporation; CM Firestop Inc; Creative Glass Designs Inc; Great Western Tile Corporation; Guardian Building Products Distribution Inc; Hanson Aggregates Pacific Southwest Inc; Hasson Painting Contractors Inc; Hightower Finishing Inc; Malcom Drilling Company Inc; Mission Pools of Escondido Inc; Newway Structures Inc; Pablo Leyden Corporation; Paul Hansen Equipment Inc; Peter Ross CA Inc; Progressive Steel Fabricators Inc; Southland Electric Inc; Starline Windows Inc; TB Penick & Sons Inc; Western Fire Protection Inc; William Kelly & Sons California Inc; Kammerer Enterprises Inc; Mission Pools of Escondido; Standard Plumbing & Industrial Supply Co; EL Cajon Grading & Engineering Co Inc Filed By: PARK PLACE ON HARBOR DRIVE OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); Park Place On Harbor Drive Owners Associatiom (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HIGHTOWER FINISHING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PAUL HANSEN EQUIPMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where NEWWAY STRUCTURES INC; ESA : NEWAY STRUCTURES INC is a litigant