This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/10/2022 at 22:41:12 (UTC).

Papel vs Goddard Systems Inc

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 Papel filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Goddard Systems Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EARL H. MAAS, III. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EARL H. MAAS, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAPEL, PHINLEY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

THE DHIMAN SCHOOL INC; DBA : THE GODDARD SCHOOL;ESA : SHALINI DHIMAN DBA THE GODDARD SCHOOL OF CARLSBAD

DHIMAN SCHOOL INC; DBA : THE GODDARD SCHOOL

GODDARD SYSTEM INC

ALR Nevada Inc; DBA : Lunstrum Windows & Doors

DOOR COMPONENTS, INC

Ledcor Construction INC

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

GODDARD SYSTEM INC

ROES 1-50

ALR Nevada Inc; DBA : Lunstrum Windows & Doors

DOOR COMPONENTS, INC

Dhiman, Shalini ; DBA : Goddard School of Carlsbad

Ledcor Construction INC

CDS ARCHITECTS, INC; DBA : SMITH CONSULTING ARCHITECTS

Assa Abloy Accessories and Door Controls Group Inc

Guardian Ad Litem

PAPEL, EVAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Guardian Ad Litem, Plaintiff, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

JABAGCHOURIAN, ARA

Lincoln, Thomas J

Plaintiff, Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Lincoln, Thomas J

OLSON, SONALI

Brockman, Robert W Jr

Marshall, Garrett A.

Meissner, Christina N.

Houry, Lynne Pearson

Nauss, David

Swiss, Christie Bodnar

Guardian Ad Litem and Plaintiff Attorney

JABAGCHOURIAN, ARA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ALR Nevada Inc. Refers to: CDS ARCHITECTS, INC; GODDARD SYSTEM INC; DOOR COMPONENTS, INC; Papel, Phinley

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 02/19/2021 10:30:00 AM.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by ALR Nevada Inc.

Notice of Dismissal SD

Notice of Dismissal SD generated.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (with Prejudice as to Cross-Complaint filed by ALR Nevada Inc ONLY) filed by ALR Nevada Inc. Refers to: Assa Abloy Accessories and Door Controls Group Inc; CDS ARCHITECTS, INC; DOOR COMPONENTS, INC; GODDARD SYSTEM INC

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (**Not Entered**) filed by ALR Nevada Inc.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (**Not Entered**) filed by ALR Nevada Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 01/29/2021 10:30:00 AM.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (with Prejudice as to Complaint ONLY) filed by Papel, Phinley. Refers to: ALR Nevada Inc; DHIMAN SCHOOL INC; GODDARD SYSTEM INC

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (**Not Entered**) filed by Papel, Phinley.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (with Prejudice as to Cross-Complaint filed by Goddard Systems INC 05/09/2019 ONLY) filed by GODDARD SYSTEM INC. Refers to: ALR Nevada Inc; ROES 1-50

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (with Prejudice as to Cross-Complaint filed by Dhiman School INC ONLY) filed by DHIMAN SCHOOL INC. Refers to: ALR Nevada Inc; DOOR COMPONENTS, INC; Ledcor Construction INC

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by GODDARD SYSTEM INC.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (with Prejudice as to Cross-Complaint filed by Door Components INC ONLY) filed by DOOR COMPONENTS, INC. Refers to: ALR Nevada Inc; GODDARD SYSTEM INC; Dhiman, Shalini; CDS ARCHITECTS, INC; Ledcor Construction INC

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 12/11/2020 10:30:00 AM.

Request - Other

Request - Other (REQUEST TO CONTINUE OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING) filed by Ledcor Construction INC. Refers to: ALR Nevada Inc

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by GODDARD SYSTEM INC.

Notice of Order and Continued Hearing Re Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed

Notice of Hearing filed by GODDARD SYSTEM INC.

164 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by ALR Nevada Inc. Refers to: CDS ARCHITECTS, INC; GODDARD SYSTEM INC; DOOR COMPONENTS, INC; Papel, Phinley; Filed By: ALR Nevada Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 02/19/2021 10:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by ALR Nevada Inc.; Filed By: ALR Nevada Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to ALR Nevada Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Ledcor Construction INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAmended Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to GODDARD SYSTEM INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAmended Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to DOOR COMPONENTS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAmended Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to CDS ARCHITECTS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
220 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by Papel, Phinley. Refers to: THE DHIMAN SCHOOL INC; Filed By: Papel, Phinley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Papel, Phinley.; Filed By: Papel, Phinley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Papel, Phinley. Refers to: THE DHIMAN SCHOOL INC; Filed By: Papel, Phinley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/26/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Papel, Phinley. Refers to: THE DHIMAN SCHOOL INC; Dhilman, Shalini; Filed By: Papel, Phinley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Papel, Phinley. Refers to: THE DHIMAN SCHOOL INC; Dhilman, Shalini; Filed By: Papel, Phinley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Papel, Phinley. Refers to: DHIMAN SCHOOL INC; Papel, Evan; GODDARD SYSTEM INC; ALR Nevada Inc; Filed By: Papel, Phinley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less