This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 06:57:04 (UTC).

Palomar Melrose LP vs Moore

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Palomar Melrose LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Moore. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Palomar Melrose LP

Defendant

Moore, Wendy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Seide, Richard L

Attorney at RICHARD L SEIDE APC

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Summons

Original Summons filed by Palomar Melrose LP. Refers to: Moore, Wendy

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Palomar Melrose LP. Refers to: Moore, Wendy

Complaint

Complaint filed by Palomar Melrose LP. Refers to: Moore, Wendy

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Palomar Melrose LP.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement filed by Palomar Melrose LP. Filed By: Palomar Melrose LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Palomar Melrose LP. Refers to: Moore, Wendy Filed By: Palomar Melrose LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Palomar Melrose LP. Refers to: Moore, Wendy Filed By: Palomar Melrose LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Palomar Melrose LP. Refers to: Moore, Wendy Filed By: Palomar Melrose LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seide, Richard L