This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 08:28:15 (UTC).

Palomar Health vs City of Poway

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 Palomar Health filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against City of Poway. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALOMAR HEALTH

Defendant

City of Poway

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Serino, Natasha N

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ALEXANDER M SHACK

16870 W Bernardo Dr Suite #400

San Diego, CA 92127

Defendant Attorney

Levine, Joshua N

Attorney at BOOTH LLP

11835 W Olympic Boulevard 600

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by PALOMAR HEALTH. Refers to: City of Poway

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PALOMAR HEALTH. Refers to: City of Poway

Complaint

Complaint filed by PALOMAR HEALTH. Refers to: City of Poway

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by PALOMAR HEALTH.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by PALOMAR HEALTH. Refers to: City of Poway

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by City of Poway.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by PALOMAR HEALTH.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by PALOMAR HEALTH. Refers to: City of Poway

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to City of Poway.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to PALOMAR HEALTH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by PALOMAR HEALTH. Refers to: City of Poway Filed By: PALOMAR HEALTH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by PALOMAR HEALTH. Filed By: PALOMAR HEALTH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by City of Poway. Filed By: City of Poway (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by PALOMAR HEALTH. Refers to: City of Poway Filed By: PALOMAR HEALTH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by PALOMAR HEALTH. Filed By: PALOMAR HEALTH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by PALOMAR HEALTH. Refers to: City of Poway Filed By: PALOMAR HEALTH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by PALOMAR HEALTH. Refers to: City of Poway Filed By: PALOMAR HEALTH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by PALOMAR HEALTH. Refers to: City of Poway Filed By: PALOMAR HEALTH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Palomar Health District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SERINO NATASHA NARAGHI