This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 06:27:52 (UTC).

Palacios vs County of San Diego

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Palacios filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against County of San Diego. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Palacios, James

PALACIO, JENNIFER

Defendants

City of Vista

County of San Diego

Department of Public Works

City of San Marcos

North County Transit District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Weck, Cory R

Attorney at MCCUNE WRIGHT AREVALO LLP

3281 E Guasti Rd

Ontario, CA 91761

Popka, Brynna

3281 East Guasti Road 7Th Floor

Ontario, CA 91761

Defendant Attorney

Welsh, Christopher J

1600 Pacific Highway Room 355

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Palacios, James.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Palacios, James; Palacios, James.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Palacios, James; Palacios, James.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Palacios, James; Palacios, James.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Palacios, James; Palacios, James.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Palacios, James.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Palacios, James

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Palacios, James. Refers to: Department of Public Works; City of Vista; City of San Marcos; North County Transit District

Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (not entered) filed by County of San Diego. Refers to: Department of Public Works; City of Vista; City of San Marcos; North County Transit District

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by County of San Diego.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Palacios, James.

Defendant County of San Diego's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by County of San Diego.

Defendant County of San Diego's Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by County of San Diego.

Defendant County of San Diego's Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by County of San Diego.

Defendant County of San Diego's Amended Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by County of San Diego.

Defendant County of San Diego Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by County of San Diego.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/01/2021 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Settlement Conference (Civil) scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Settlement Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSettlement Conference (Civil) scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 10/21/2022 at 09:15AM before Judge Earl H. Maas, III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 09:15AM before Judge Earl H. Maas, III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/01/2021 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by County of San Diego. Filed By: County of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by County of San Diego. Filed By: County of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Palacios, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by County of San Diego. Filed By: County of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by County of San Diego. Filed By: County of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Palacios, James. Refers to: County of San Diego; Department of Public Works; City of Vista; City of San Marcos; North County Transit District Filed By: Palacios, James (Plaintiff); PALACIO, JENNIFER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Palacios, James. Refers to: County of San Diego; Department of Public Works; City of Vista; City of San Marcos; North County Transit District Filed By: Palacios, James (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Palacios, James. Refers to: County of San Diego; Department of Public Works; City of Vista; City of San Marcos; North County Transit District Filed By: Palacios, James (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/01/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH COUNTY TRANSIT DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Welsh, Christopher J