This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 08:47:38 (UTC).

Pagano vs Carroll's Community Care

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Pagano filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Carroll's Community Care. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pagano, Khetrina

Defendants

Carroll's Community Care

DM Meyers Inc

Hernandez, Rogelio

Meyers Jr, Donald M

Meyers, Willie Ann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

De Santis, Thomas J

Lynn, Samuel G.

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: Carroll's Community Care; DM Meyers Inc; Meyers, Donald; Meyers, Willie; Hernandez, Rogelio

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: Carroll's Community Care; DM Meyers Inc; Meyers, Donald; Meyers, Willie; Hernandez, Rogelio

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: Carroll's Community Care; DM Meyers Inc; Meyers, Donald; Meyers, Willie; Hernandez, Rogelio

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: Hernandez, Rogelio

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: Meyers, Donald

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: DM Meyers Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: Carroll's Community Care

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: Meyers, Willie

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: Meyers, Willie; Filed By: Pagano, Khetrina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: Carroll's Community Care; Filed By: Pagano, Khetrina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: DM Meyers Inc; Filed By: Pagano, Khetrina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: Meyers, Donald; Filed By: Pagano, Khetrina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: Hernandez, Rogelio; Filed By: Pagano, Khetrina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/30/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: Carroll's Community Care; DM Meyers Inc; Meyers, Donald; Meyers, Willie; Hernandez, Rogelio; Filed By: Pagano, Khetrina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: Carroll's Community Care; DM Meyers Inc; Meyers, Donald; Meyers, Willie; Hernandez, Rogelio; Filed By: Pagano, Khetrina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Pagano, Khetrina. Refers to: Carroll's Community Care; DM Meyers Inc; Meyers, Donald; Meyers, Willie; Hernandez, Rogelio; Filed By: Pagano, Khetrina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less