This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/12/2018 06:54:37

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by Pacific Western Bank against El Cajon Gun Exchange Inc in the jurisdiction of San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-CTL
  • Filing Date 07/10/2017
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Contract - Other Contract
  • Jurisdiction San Diego County Superior Courts
  • Judge Timothy Taylor
  • Courthouse Central Courthouse
  • County San Diego
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Pacific Western Bank
  • Represented By
    • Sexton, William J
  • Defendant American Shooting Center Inc
  • Represented By
    • Haynes, Stephen K
  • Defendant El Cajon Gun Exchange Inc
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

default

[Another document for ROA# 38]

Fees Apply
Temporary Restraining Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Claim and Delivery) filed by Pa...

Fees Apply
Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Pacific Western Bank. ...

Fees Apply
Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by Pacific ...

Fees Apply
Reply to Opposition - Other

Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Pacific Western Bank.

Fees Apply
Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Pacific Western Bank.

Fees Apply
Order for Writ of Possession

Order for Writ of Possession filed by Pacific Western Bank. ...

Fees Apply
Opposition of Defendant American Shooting Center, Inc. to Ap...

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations fil...

Fees Apply
Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: El Cajon Gun Exc...

Fees Apply
Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Fees Apply
Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/13/201...

Fees Apply
Declaration J Alexandra Rhim

Declaration - Other (Declaration J Alexandra Rhim) filed by ...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2018
  • Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/13/2018 01:30:00 PM.
  • 04/13/2018
  • Order for Writ of Possession filed by Pacific Western Bank. Refers to: American Shooting Center Inc Filed By: Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)
  • 04/13/2018
  • Temporary Restraining Order (Claim and Delivery) filed by Pacific Western Bank. Refers to: American Shooting Center Inc Filed By: Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)
  • 04/11/2018
  • The default filed by Pacific Western Bank was entered as to El Cajon Gun Exchange Inc on Complaint . Override feature used.
  • 04/11/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Pacific Western Bank. Refers to: El Cajon Gun Exchange Inc Filed By: Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)
  • 04/11/2018
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.
  • 04/11/2018
  • [Another document for ROA# 38]
  • 04/11/2018
  • The default filed by was denied. Refers to: El Cajon Gun Exchange Inc Filed By: Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)
  • 04/09/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by Pacific Western Bank. Refers to: El Cajon Gun Exchange Inc Filed By: Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)
  • 04/09/2018
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
  • 04/06/2018
  • Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Pacific Western Bank. Filed By: Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)
  • 04/02/2018
  • Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by American Shooting Center Inc. Filed By: American Shooting Center Inc (Defendant)
  • 03/20/2018
  • Proof of Service filed by Pacific Western Bank. Filed By: Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)
  • 03/20/2018
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration J Alexandra Rhim) filed by Pacific Western Bank. Filed By: Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)
  • 03/20/2018
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration Maryann Hobbs) filed by Pacific Western Bank. Filed By: Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)
  • 03/20/2018
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Pacific Western Bank. Filed By: Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)
  • 03/20/2018
  • Request for Judicial Notice filed by Pacific Western Bank. Filed By: Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)
  • 03/20/2018
  • Application and Notice of Hearing for Order to Terminate, Modify, or Vacate Temporary Protective Order filed by Pacific Western Bank. Filed By: Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)
  • 03/20/2018
  • Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing filed by Pacific Western Bank. Filed By: Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)
  • 03/20/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession filed by Pacific Western Bank. Filed By: Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.