This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 18:27:48 (UTC).

Pacific Mechanical Contractors Inc vs. Lend Lease (US) Construction Inc

Case Summary

On 07/01/2011 Pacific Mechanical Contractors Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Lend Lease US Construction Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN S. MEYER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN S. MEYER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC RIM MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS INC

Defendants

THOMAS JEFFERSON SCHOOL OF LAW

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

LEND LEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION INC; FKA : BOVIS LEND LEASE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASON, MICHAEL J

Defendant Attorney

RUPE, RYAN G

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 06/27/17 - volume 4 of 4

Case File Contents as of 06/27/17 - volume 4 of 4

Case File Contents as of 07/18/17 - volume 1 of 4

Case File Contents as of 07/18/17 - volume 1 of 4

Case File Contents as of 07/18/17 - volume 2 of 4

Case File Contents as of 07/18/17 - volume 2 of 4

Case File Contents as of 07/18/17 - volume 3 of 4

Case File Contents as of 07/18/17 - volume 3 of 4

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/31/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/06/2012 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/06/2012 09:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/04/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/20/2012 10:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/16/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/24/2012 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Court Trial was rescheduled to 11/02/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in C-61 before John S. Meyer at Central.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/28/2012 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 09/28/2012 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/18/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCase File Contents as of 07/18/17 - volume 3 of 4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCase File Contents as of 07/18/17 - volume 2 of 4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCase File Contents as of 07/18/17 - volume 1 of 4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCase File Contents as of 06/27/17 - volume 4 of 4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2013
View Court Documents

DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2013

DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2012

DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Pacific Rim Mechanical Contractors Inc; Lend Lease (US) Construction Inc. Filed By: Pacific Rim Mechanical Contractors Inc (Plaintiff); Lend Lease (US) Construction Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2012
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2012
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 09/28/2012 10:00:00 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2012

DocketCivil Court Trial set for 11/02/12 at 9:00 am vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
74 More Docket Entries
07/13/2011

DocketOriginal Summons (Second Amended Complaint) filed by Pacific Mechanical Contractors Inc. Refers to: Lend Lease (US) Construction Inc; Thomas Jefferson School Of Law; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Filed By: Pacific Rim Mechanical Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2011

DocketAmended Complaint (Second) filed by Pacific Mechanical Contractors Inc. Refers to: Lend Lease (US) Construction Inc; Thomas Jefferson School Of Law; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Filed By: Pacific Rim Mechanical Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2011

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2011

DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by Pacific Mechanical Contractors Inc. Refers to: Lend Lease (US) Construction Inc; Thomas Jefferson School Of Law Filed By: Pacific Rim Mechanical Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2011

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Pacific Mechanical Contractors Inc. Refers to: Lend Lease (US) Construction Inc; Thomas Jefferson School Of Law Filed By: Pacific Rim Mechanical Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2011

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2011

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2011

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pacific Mechanical Contractors Inc. Refers to: Lend Lease (US) Construction Inc; Thomas Jefferson School Of Law Filed By: Pacific Rim Mechanical Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2011

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Pacific Mechanical Contractors Inc. Refers to: Lend Lease (US) Construction Inc; Thomas Jefferson School Of Law Filed By: Pacific Rim Mechanical Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2011

DocketComplaint filed by Pacific Mechanical Contractors Inc. Refers to: Lend Lease (US) Construction Inc; Thomas Jefferson School Of Law Filed By: Pacific Rim Mechanical Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less