Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/20/2020 at 08:25:03 (UTC).

Pacific Highlands Ranch LP VS Rivera

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Pacific Highlands Ranch LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Rivera. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pacific Highlands Ranch LP

Defendant

Rivera, Shannon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garcia, Eduardo

Attorney at KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Application for Order Allowing Service of Summons by Posting and Mailing

Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (ORDER SIGNED 2-3-2020) filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon

Declaration of Due Diligence

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Including Unknowns) filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Entered, Including Unknowns) filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP received but not filed on 02/26/2020.

Proof of service by Posting(UD)

Proof of service by Posting(UD) filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Including Unknowns) filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon Filed By: Pacific Highlands Ranch LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for Pacific Highlands Ranch LP and against Rivera, Shannon for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (Entered, Including Unknowns) filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon Filed By: Pacific Highlands Ranch LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP received but not filed on 02/26/2020. Filed By: Pacific Highlands Ranch LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service by Posting(UD) filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon Filed By: Pacific Highlands Ranch LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Filed By: Pacific Highlands Ranch LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Rivera, Shannon on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (ORDER SIGNED 2-3-2020) filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon Filed By: Pacific Highlands Ranch LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon Filed By: Pacific Highlands Ranch LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon Filed By: Pacific Highlands Ranch LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon Filed By: Pacific Highlands Ranch LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Pacific Highlands Ranch LP. Refers to: Rivera, Shannon Filed By: Pacific Highlands Ranch LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less