This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 17:57:39 (UTC).

Pacific Commerce Bank vs Dream Design Builders LLC

Case Summary

On 05/09/2018 Pacific Commerce Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Dream Design Builders LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W POLLACK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY W POLLACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC COMMERCE BANK

Defendants

DREAM DESIGN BUILDERS LLC

DREAM MAKER BUILDERS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAZAR, GEORGE C

Attorney at FOX JOHNS LAZAR PEKIN & WEXLER APC

7676 Hazard Center Dr 5Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other (Stipulation Terminating Temporary Protective Order and Right to Attach Order re: Dream Design Builders) filed by Pacific Commerce Bank; Dream Design Builders LLC.

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other (Stipulation Terminating Temporary Protective Order and Right to Attach Order re: Western Surety Company) filed by Pacific Commerce Bank.

Proof of Service of Summons on Dream Maker Builders

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pacific Commerce Bank. Refers to: Dream Maker Builders Inc

Proof of Service of Summons on Dream Design

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pacific Commerce Bank. Refers to: Dream Design Builders LLC

Proof of Service (Personal) of Temporary Protective Order

Proof of Service filed by Pacific Commerce Bank.

Ex Parte Application - Declaration re Notice

Declaration - Other (Declaration re Notice) filed by Pacific Commerce Bank.

Proposed Order - Ex Parte Right to Attach Order

Ex Parte Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment (Resident) filed by Pacific Commerce Bank.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by Pacific Commerce Bank received but not filed on 05/22/2018.

Proposed Order

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Ex Parte Application for Ex Parte Right to Attach Order and Temporary Protective Order

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Ex Parte Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment (Nonresident)

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Ex Parte Application - Memorandum of Points and Authorities

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Temporary Protective Order

Temporary Protective Order filed by Pacific Commerce Bank.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Pacific Commerce Bank.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pacific Commerce Bank. Refers to: Dream Design Builders LLC; Dream Maker Builders Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Pacific Commerce Bank. Refers to: Dream Design Builders LLC; Dream Maker Builders Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/12/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Pacific Commerce Bank.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Dream Maker Builders Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Dream Design Builders LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Pacific Commerce Bank. Filed By: Pacific Commerce Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/28/2018 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other (Stipulation Terminating Temporary Protective Order and Right to Attach Order re: Western Surety Company) filed by Pacific Commerce Bank. Filed By: Pacific Commerce Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other (Stipulation Terminating Temporary Protective Order and Right to Attach Order re: Dream Design Builders) filed by Pacific Commerce Bank; Dream Design Builders LLC. Filed By: Pacific Commerce Bank (Plaintiff); Dream Design Builders LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (for Orders pursuant to Stipulation Terminating Right to Attach Order and Exonerating Bond) filed by Pacific Commerce Bank. Filed By: Pacific Commerce Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 06/28/2018 at 08:15:00 AM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. filed by Pacific Commerce Bank. Filed By: Pacific Commerce Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Pacific Commerce Bank. Filed By: Pacific Commerce Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 05/24/2018 at 08:15:00 AM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/12/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Pacific Commerce Bank. Refers to: Dream Design Builders LLC; Dream Maker Builders Inc Filed By: Pacific Commerce Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pacific Commerce Bank. Refers to: Dream Design Builders LLC; Dream Maker Builders Inc Filed By: Pacific Commerce Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Pacific Commerce Bank. Refers to: Dream Design Builders LLC; Dream Maker Builders Inc Filed By: Pacific Commerce Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAZAR GEORGE CHESNAYE