This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 05:00:36 (UTC).

Pacific Bell Directory vs. Michelle Hollimon

Case Summary

On 03/01/2010 Pacific Bell Directory filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Michelle Hollimon. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC BELL DIRECTORY

Defendant

HOLLIMON, MICHELLE ; DBA : LAW OFFICES OF MICHELLE CARLISLE HOLLIMON

San Diego, CA 92123

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNNING, DONALD T

Attorney at THE DUNNING LAW FIRM APC

4545 Murphy Canyon Rd Suite 210

San Diego, CA 92123

Defendant Attorney

HOLLIMON, MICHELLE CARLISLE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHELLE CARLISLE HOLLIMON AP

4540 Kearny Villa Rd Ste 210

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 1

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/22/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/22/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 10/24/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 10/24/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Order to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD

OSC - Non-Sanction scheduled for 11/30/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Non-Sanction heard 11/30/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Pacific Bell Directory rejected on 02/15/2012. Refers to: Hollimon, Michelle

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Pacific Bell Directory and against Hollimon, Michelle for $ 65798.41, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 18697.00, prejudgment costs: $ 402.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 84897.41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • Judgment by Default by Court (with Supporting Declarations) filed by Pacific Bell Directory. Refers to: Hollimon, Michelle Filed By: Pacific Bell Directory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • Application for Entry of Judgment (and Dismissal of Does) filed by Pacific Bell Directory. Refers to: Hollimon, Michelle Filed By: Pacific Bell Directory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • Location changed to D-07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • Case located in Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Pacific Bell Directory rejected on 02/15/2012. Refers to: Hollimon, Michelle Filed By: Pacific Bell Directory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Pacific Bell Directory. Refers to: Hollimon, Michelle Filed By: Pacific Bell Directory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Case located in Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2011
  • Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - mediation did not take place (Case not mediated prior to expiration of mediator appointment) filed by GLASS, DOUGLAS A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/22/2011 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • This matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/22/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • Certificate of Service filed by Pacific Bell Directory. Refers to: Hollimon, Michelle Filed By: Pacific Bell Directory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pacific Bell Directory. Refers to: Hollimon, Michelle Filed By: Pacific Bell Directory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pacific Bell Directory. Refers to: Hollimon, Michelle Filed By: Pacific Bell Directory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • Complaint filed by Pacific Bell Directory. Refers to: Hollimon, Michelle Filed By: Pacific Bell Directory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.