This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/19/2022 at 08:10:10 (UTC).

OTAY MESA SALES INC vs PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 OTAY MESA SALES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR FABRICATION INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OTAY MESA SALES INC

Defendants

BAIN, DAVID LEE

MOORE, DAVID JOHN

PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC

WOLTER, DANIELLE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOLEFIELD, PAMELA J

Attorney at SCHOLEFIELD PC CONSTRUCTION LAW

13475 Danieldson Street Suite 100

Poway, CA 92064

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Punitive Damages

Notice - Other filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC; BAIN, DAVID; MOORE, DAVID; WOLTER, DANIELLE

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC; BAIN, DAVID; MOORE, DAVID; WOLTER, DANIELLE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC; BAIN, DAVID; MOORE, DAVID; WOLTER, DANIELLE

Complaint

Complaint filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC; BAIN, DAVID; MOORE, DAVID; WOLTER, DANIELLE

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/01/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to BAIN, DAVID LEE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to MOORE, DAVID JOHN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to WOLTER, DANIELLE M .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to OTAY MESA SALES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/01/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC; BAIN, DAVID; MOORE, DAVID; WOLTER, DANIELLE Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC; BAIN, DAVID; MOORE, DAVID; WOLTER, DANIELLE Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC; BAIN, DAVID; MOORE, DAVID; WOLTER, DANIELLE Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC; BAIN, DAVID; MOORE, DAVID; WOLTER, DANIELLE Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Otay Mesa Sales Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOLEFIELD, PAMELA J.