This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/15/2022 at 07:05:27 (UTC).

OTAY MESA SALES INC vs MMJS Engineering

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 OTAY MESA SALES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MMJS Engineering. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OTAY MESA SALES INC

Defendants

American Contractors Indemnity Company

Blanchard, Barry Raymond

MARTINI, MARK ANTHONY

MINOR, PILAR BRISENO

MMJS ENTERPRISES LLC

MMJS Engineering

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scholefield, Pamela J

Attorney at SCHOLEFIELD P C

13475 Danielson Street Suite 100

Poway, CA 92064

Defendant Attorneys

Kim, Amber N

625 S The City Drive 190

Orange, CA 92868

Hout, Gregory J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY J HOUT

12396 World Trade Drive 206

San Diego, CA 92128

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company.

Answer of Defendant Barry Raymond Blanchard to Complaint

Answer filed by Blanchard, Barry Raymond.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Undertaking ($10,000.00) submitted by OTAY MESA SALES INC rejected on 10/20/2022.

Index of Exhibits

Exhibit List filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC.

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc.

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC.

Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment

Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: American Contractors Indemnity Company

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: MINOR, PILAR

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: Blanchard, Barry

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: MMJS Engineering

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Punitive Damages

Notice - Other filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: MMJS Engineering; MMJS ENTERPRISES LLC; MARTINI, MARK; Blanchard, Barry; MINOR, PILAR; American Contractors Indemnity Company

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: MMJS Engineering; MMJS ENTERPRISES LLC; MARTINI, MARK; Blanchard, Barry; MINOR, PILAR; American Contractors Indemnity Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: MMJS Engineering; MMJS ENTERPRISES LLC; MARTINI, MARK; Blanchard, Barry; MINOR, PILAR; American Contractors Indemnity Company

Complaint

Complaint filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: MMJS Engineering; MMJS ENTERPRISES LLC; MARTINI, MARK; Blanchard, Barry; MINOR, PILAR; American Contractors Indemnity Company

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company.; Filed By: American Contractors Indemnity Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Blanchard, Barry Raymond.; Filed By: Blanchard, Barry Raymond (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUndertaking ($10,000.00) submitted by OTAY MESA SALES INC rejected on 10/20/2022.; Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 10/20/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC.; Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC.; Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC.; Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC.; Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: American Contractors Indemnity Company; Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: MMJS Engineering; Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 10/20/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: MMJS Engineering; MMJS ENTERPRISES LLC; MARTINI, MARK; Blanchard, Barry; MINOR, PILAR; American Contractors Indemnity Company; Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: MMJS Engineering; MMJS ENTERPRISES LLC; MARTINI, MARK; Blanchard, Barry; MINOR, PILAR; American Contractors Indemnity Company; Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: MMJS Engineering; MMJS ENTERPRISES LLC; MARTINI, MARK; Blanchard, Barry; MINOR, PILAR; American Contractors Indemnity Company; Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by OTAY MESA SALES INC. Refers to: MMJS Engineering; MMJS ENTERPRISES LLC; MARTINI, MARK; Blanchard, Barry; MINOR, PILAR; American Contractors Indemnity Company; Filed By: OTAY MESA SALES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Otay Mesa Sales Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOLEFIELD, PAMELA J.