This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 11:50:39 (UTC).

Otay Mesa Sales Inc vs. Eddington

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Otay Mesa Sales Inc filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Eddington. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Otay Mesa Sales Inc

Defendants

Baseline Engineering

Eddington, Michael ; AKA : Eddington, Michael Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scholefield, Pamela J

Attorney at SCHOLEFIELD P C

13475 Danielson Street Suite 100

Poway, CA 92064

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Summary of Case for Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award with Declarations in Support

Declaration - Other filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Baseline Engineering; Eddington, Michael

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Baseline Engineering; Eddington, Michael

Petition to Confirm, Correct, or Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award (Alternative Dispute Resolution)

Petition to Confirm, Correct, or Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award (Alternative Dispute Resolution) filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Baseline Engineering; Eddington, Michael

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc.

Proposed Judgment

Judgment filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Eddington, Michael; Baseline Engineering

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc.

NOTICE OF RULING ON HEARING FOR PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

Notice of Ruling filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 11/04/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Proof of Service

Declaration of Diligent Search (Declaration of Due Diligence) filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Electronic Service) filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc.

Notice of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Notice - Other (of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Eddington, Michael; Baseline Engineering Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketThe Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award was GRANTED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 11/04/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (Electronic Service) filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Diligent Search (Declaration of Due Diligence) filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition scheduled for 11/04/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-61 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Confirm, Correct, or Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award (Alternative Dispute Resolution) filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Baseline Engineering; Eddington, Michael Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Baseline Engineering; Eddington, Michael Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Baseline Engineering; Eddington, Michael Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Otay Mesa Sales Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOLEFIELD, PAMELA J.