This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/10/2022 at 03:46:39 (UTC).

Otay Mesa Sales Inc vs Arrow Automatic Fire Sprinkler Inc

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Otay Mesa Sales Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Arrow Automatic Fire Sprinkler Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Mangione. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

James A Mangione

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Otay Mesa Sales Inc

Defendants

AGOSTO, DAWNA MARIE

AGOSTO, KELSEA LYNN

Arrow Automatic Fire Sprinkler Inc

JOHNSON, LINDA KAY

PAVLICK, BRADLEY JAMES

PAVLICK, HEATHER KATHLEEN

PAVLICK, JAMES RALPH

Suretec Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scholefield, Pamela J

Attorney at SCHOLEFIELD PC CONSTRUCTION LAW

13475 Danielson Street 100

Poway, CA 92064

Defendant Attorney

Gascou, Christian J.

9696 Culver Boulevard Suite 302

Culver City, CA 90232

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arrow Automatic Fire Sprinkler Inc; AGOSTO, KELSEA; AGOSTO, DAWNA; PAVLICK, HEATHER; JOHNSON, LINDA; PAVLICK, JAMES; PAVLICK, BRADLEY; Suretec Insurance Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arrow Automatic Fire Sprinkler Inc; AGOSTO, KELSEA; AGOSTO, DAWNA; PAVLICK, HEATHER; JOHNSON, LINDA; PAVLICK, JAMES; PAVLICK, BRADLEY; Suretec Insurance Company

COMPLAINT OF OTAY MESA SALES, INC.

Complaint filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arrow Automatic Fire Sprinkler Inc; AGOSTO, KELSEA; AGOSTO, DAWNA; PAVLICK, HEATHER; JOHNSON, LINDA; PAVLICK, JAMES; PAVLICK, BRADLEY; Suretec Insurance Company

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Suretec Insurance Company.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/15/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc.; Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Otay Mesa Sales Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to PAVLICK, BRADLEY JAMES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to PAVLICK, JAMES RALPH .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to JOHNSON, LINDA KAY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to PAVLICK, HEATHER KATHLEEN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to AGOSTO, DAWNA MARIE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to AGOSTO, KELSEA LYNN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Arrow Automatic Fire Sprinkler Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Suretec Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Suretec Insurance Company.; Filed By: Suretec Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/15/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Mangione, James.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arrow Automatic Fire Sprinkler Inc; AGOSTO, KELSEA; AGOSTO, DAWNA; PAVLICK, HEATHER; JOHNSON, LINDA; PAVLICK, JAMES; PAVLICK, BRADLEY; Suretec Insurance Company; Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arrow Automatic Fire Sprinkler Inc; AGOSTO, KELSEA; AGOSTO, DAWNA; PAVLICK, HEATHER; JOHNSON, LINDA; PAVLICK, JAMES; PAVLICK, BRADLEY; Suretec Insurance Company; Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arrow Automatic Fire Sprinkler Inc; AGOSTO, KELSEA; AGOSTO, DAWNA; PAVLICK, HEATHER; JOHNSON, LINDA; PAVLICK, JAMES; PAVLICK, BRADLEY; Suretec Insurance Company; Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Otay Mesa Sales Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN