This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/18/2021 at 08:15:33 (UTC).

Otay Mesa Sales Inc vs Arent

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Otay Mesa Sales Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Arent. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Otay Mesa Sales Inc

Defendants

Arent, Scott Frederick; AKA : Arent, Scott;AKA : PIPELINE, SCOTT ARENT

Business Alliance Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scholefield, Pamela J

Attorney at SCHOLEFIELD P C

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arent, Scott; Business Alliance Insurance Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arent, Scott; Business Alliance Insurance Company

Complaint of Otay Mesa Sales, Inc.

Complaint filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arent, Scott; Business Alliance Insurance Company

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal - Scott Arent

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arent, Scott

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute - Business Alliance

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Business Alliance Insurance Company

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arent, Scott

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arent, Scott Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Arent, Scott Frederick on Complaint filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Business Alliance Insurance Company Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arent, Scott Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/25/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arent, Scott; Business Alliance Insurance Company Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arent, Scott; Business Alliance Insurance Company Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Otay Mesa Sales Inc. Refers to: Arent, Scott; Business Alliance Insurance Company Filed By: Otay Mesa Sales Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Otay Mesa Sales Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOLEFIELD, PAMELA J.