This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/28/2020 at 17:29:50 (UTC).

Osmar Aaron Lopez vs RGC Gaslamp LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2018 Osmar Aaron Lopez filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RGC Gaslamp LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE BACAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE BACAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ, OSMAR

Defendants

RGC GASLAMP LLC

CLIQUE HOSPITALITY SAN DIEGO LLC

MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS LLC

CLIQUE HOSPITALITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAVA, ALFRED G

3667 Voltaire St

San Diego, CA 92106

Defendant Attorney

PRICE, LESLIE M JR

Attorney at TYSON & MENDES

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Lopez, Osmar.

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Lopez, Osmar.

Plaintiff's Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Defendants' Answer

Demurrer (to Answer) filed by Lopez, Osmar.

Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Alfred Rava in Support of Plaintiff's Demurrer to Defendants' Answer

Declaration - Other (of Alfred G Rava) filed by Lopez, Osmar.

Proposed Order Re Plaintiff's Demurrer to Defendants' Answer

Proposed Order (Re Demurrer to Answer) submitted by Lopez, Osmar received but not filed on 05/02/2018.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Demurrer to Defendants' Answer

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Lopez, Osmar.

Answer

Answer filed by RGC Gaslamp LLC; Montage Hotels & Resorts LLC; Clique Hospitality San Diego LLC; Clique Hospitality LLC.

Proof of Service of Summons for RGC Gaslamp LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lopez, Osmar. Refers to: RGC Gaslamp LLC

Proof of Service of Summons for Montage Hotels & Resorts, LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lopez, Osmar. Refers to: Montage Hotels & Resorts LLC

Proof of Service of Summons for Clique Hospitality San Diego LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lopez, Osmar. Refers to: Clique Hospitality San Diego LLC

Proof of Service of Summons By Certified Mail for Clique Hospitality L.L.C.

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by Lopez, Osmar. Refers to: Clique Hospitality LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Lopez, Osmar. Refers to: RGC Gaslamp LLC; Montage Hotels & Resorts LLC; Clique Hospitality San Diego LLC; Clique Hospitality LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lopez, Osmar. Refers to: RGC Gaslamp LLC; Montage Hotels & Resorts LLC; Clique Hospitality San Diego LLC; Clique Hospitality LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Lopez, Osmar. Refers to: RGC Gaslamp LLC; Montage Hotels & Resorts LLC; Clique Hospitality San Diego LLC; Clique Hospitality LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Lopez, Osmar. Filed By: Lopez, Osmar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to RGC Gaslamp LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Montage Hotels & Resorts LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Clique Hospitality San Diego LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Clique Hospitality LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Lopez, Osmar .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/07/2018 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 07/20/2018 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Lopez, Osmar. Filed By: Lopez, Osmar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 07/20/2018 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lopez, Osmar. Refers to: Montage Hotels & Resorts LLC Filed By: Lopez, Osmar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lopez, Osmar. Refers to: Clique Hospitality San Diego LLC Filed By: Lopez, Osmar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by Lopez, Osmar. Refers to: Clique Hospitality LLC Filed By: Lopez, Osmar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/07/2018 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Lopez, Osmar. Refers to: RGC Gaslamp LLC; Montage Hotels & Resorts LLC; Clique Hospitality San Diego LLC; Clique Hospitality LLC Filed By: Lopez, Osmar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lopez, Osmar. Refers to: RGC Gaslamp LLC; Montage Hotels & Resorts LLC; Clique Hospitality San Diego LLC; Clique Hospitality LLC Filed By: Lopez, Osmar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Lopez, Osmar. Refers to: RGC Gaslamp LLC; Montage Hotels & Resorts LLC; Clique Hospitality San Diego LLC; Clique Hospitality LLC Filed By: Lopez, Osmar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less