Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 06:51:26 (UTC).

Oseguera vs. Equifax Information Services LLC

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Oseguera filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Equifax Information Services LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oseguera, Arturo

Defendants

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC

TRANS UNION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Friedman, Todd M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TODD M FRIEDMAN PC

Defendant Attorneys

Fares, Anthony Michael

Attorney at JONES DAY

Marker, Kristin L.

 

Court Documents

Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint

Answer filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by TRANS UNION LLC.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Oseguera, Arturo. Refers to: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC; EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC; TRANS UNION LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Oseguera, Arturo. Refers to: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC; EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC; TRANS UNION LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Oseguera, Arturo. Refers to: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC; EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC; TRANS UNION LLC

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/21/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Oseguera, Arturo. Refers to: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Oseguera, Arturo. Refers to: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Oseguera, Arturo.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/21/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by TRANS UNION LLC. Filed By: TRANS UNION LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC. Filed By: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Oseguera, Arturo. Filed By: Oseguera, Arturo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Oseguera, Arturo. Refers to: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC Filed By: Oseguera, Arturo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Oseguera, Arturo. Refers to: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC Filed By: Oseguera, Arturo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Oseguera, Arturo. Refers to: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC; EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC; TRANS UNION LLC Filed By: Oseguera, Arturo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Oseguera, Arturo. Refers to: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC; EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC; TRANS UNION LLC Filed By: Oseguera, Arturo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Oseguera, Arturo. Refers to: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC; EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC; TRANS UNION LLC Filed By: Oseguera, Arturo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/21/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN TODD M.