This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 09:20:13 (UTC).

OSCAR SANCHEZ vs. VIASAT INC

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 OSCAR SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VIASAT INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ, OSCAR

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

VIASAT INC

LEVINE INVESTMENTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

SMITH CONSULTING ARCHITECTS

THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, WILLIAM W

3419 Via Lido #607

Newport Beach, CA 92663

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Hepps, Steven M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD E BISHOP

150 Royall Street 100

Canton, MA 02021

Potocki, Joseph P

401 B Street 1470

San Diego, CA 92101

Potocki, Joseph P.

401 B Street 1470

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by SANCHEZ, OSCAR. Refers to: SMITH CONSULTING ARCHITECTS

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 2) filed by SANCHEZ, OSCAR. Refers to: THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by SANCHEZ, OSCAR. Refers to: VIASAT INC; SMITH CONSULTING ARCHITECTS; THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by SANCHEZ, OSCAR. Refers to: VIASAT INC; SMITH CONSULTING ARCHITECTS; THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO

Answer of Defendant The Whiting-Turner Contracting Co. to Complaint of Oscar Sanchez

Answer filed by THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO.

Summons - Cross-Complaint

Original Summons filed by THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO.

Cross-Complaint of The Whiting-Turner Contracting Co.

Cross-Complaint filed by THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO.

Case Management Statement - Viasat, Inc.

Case Management Statement filed by VIASAT INC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by SANCHEZ, OSCAR.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/16/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Request for Dismissal (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (not entered) filed by SANCHEZ, OSCAR. Refers to: SMITH CONSULTING ARCHITECTS

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 3) filed by SANCHEZ, OSCAR. Refers to: LEVINE INVESTMENTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by SANCHEZ, OSCAR. Refers to: VIASAT INC; SMITH CONSULTING ARCHITECTS; LEVINE INVESTMENTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Management Statement by The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company

Case Management Statement filed by THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO.

Case Management Statement - Viasat, Inc.

Case Management Statement filed by VIASAT INC.

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDiscovery Hearing scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Correcting Court Record (Re: ROA 60) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDiscovery Hearing scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDiscovery Hearing scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDiscovery Hearing scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (to compel further responses to form interrogatories) filed by THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO. Filed By: THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by VIASAT INC. Filed By: VIASAT INC (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by VIASAT INC. Filed By: VIASAT INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by VIASAT INC. Filed By: VIASAT INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/16/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by SANCHEZ, OSCAR. Refers to: VIASAT INC; SMITH CONSULTING ARCHITECTS; THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO; LEVINE INVESTMENTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP Filed By: SANCHEZ, OSCAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by SANCHEZ, OSCAR. Refers to: VIASAT INC Filed By: SANCHEZ, OSCAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by SANCHEZ, OSCAR. Refers to: VIASAT INC Filed By: SANCHEZ, OSCAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan is a litigant

Latest cases where THE WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN WILLIAM WARREN