This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/05/2020 at 16:23:13 (UTC).

Ortega VS Veros Credit Direct LLC

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Ortega filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Veros Credit Direct LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ortega, Christian

Defendant

Veros Credit Direct LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rocco, Joseph

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF PAUL MANKIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 12/18/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in C-64 before John S. Meyer at Central.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Ortega, Christian.

Summons

Complaint filed by Ortega, Christian. Refers to: Veros Credit Direct LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ortega, Christian. Refers to: Veros Credit Direct LLC

Summons

Original Summons filed by Ortega, Christian. Refers to: Veros Credit Direct LLC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 12/18/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in C-64 before John S. Meyer at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Ortega, Christian. Filed By: Ortega, Christian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ortega, Christian. Refers to: Veros Credit Direct LLC Filed By: Ortega, Christian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ortega, Christian. Refers to: Veros Credit Direct LLC Filed By: Ortega, Christian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Ortega, Christian. Refers to: Veros Credit Direct LLC Filed By: Ortega, Christian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/14/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.