This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 03:44:07 (UTC).

ORTEGA vs GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 ORTEGA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ortega, Julia

Ortega, Lisandro

Defendant

Gutierrez, Carmen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Keck, Timothy J

9121 Haven Avenue 215

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Ortega, Lisandro; Ortega, Julia. Refers to: Gutierrez, Carmen

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ortega, Lisandro; Ortega, Julia. Refers to: Gutierrez, Carmen

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Ortega, Lisandro; Ortega, Julia. Refers to: Gutierrez, Carmen

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/30/2022 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD

Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: OSC - Sanctions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/30/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketOSC - Sanctions scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 09:00AM before Judge Cynthia A. Freeland.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 04/28/2023 at 09:00AM before Judge Cynthia A. Freeland.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/30/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Freeland, Cynthia.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Ortega, Lisandro; Ortega, Julia. Refers to: Gutierrez, Carmen; Filed By: Ortega, Lisandro (Plaintiff); Ortega, Julia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ortega, Lisandro; Ortega, Julia. Refers to: Gutierrez, Carmen; Filed By: Ortega, Lisandro (Plaintiff); Ortega, Julia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ortega, Lisandro; Ortega, Julia. Refers to: Gutierrez, Carmen; Filed By: Ortega, Lisandro (Plaintiff); Ortega, Julia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keck, Timothy J